blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0280018

EP0280018 - Means for securing a seal boot on a ball joint in an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.1991
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.06.1991 [1991/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG.
Postfach 1220
49441 Lemförde / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]For all designated states
LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG.
Postfach 1220
D-49441 Lemförde / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Buhl, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Eichendorffstrasse 9
D-4508 Bohmte / DE
[1988/35]
Representative(s)Bruse, Willy Hans Heinrich
Edisonstrasse 14
28357 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]Bruse, Willy Hans Heinrich
Edisonstrasse 14
D-28357 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date88100492.315.01.1988
[1988/35]
Priority number, dateDE1987370584724.02.1987         Original published format: DE 3705847
[1988/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0280018
Date:31.08.1988
Language:DE
[1988/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0280018
Date:19.07.1989
Language:DE
[1989/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0280018
Date:27.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:F16C11/06, F16C33/72
[1988/35]
CPC:
F16C11/0628 (EP); F16C11/08 (KR); F16C11/0671 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1988/35]
TitleGerman:Befestigung der Dichtungsmanschette eines Kugelgelenkes für Kraftfahrzeuge[1988/35]
English:Means for securing a seal boot on a ball joint in an automotive vehicle[1988/35]
French:Fixation du soufflet d'étanchéité d'une articulation à rotule pour véhicule automobile[1988/35]
Examination procedure07.07.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
13.07.1989Examination requested  [1989/36]
22.09.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.09.1989Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
02.01.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.1990Fee for grant paid
11.01.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.03.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1477649  (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD);
 [X]DE2402491  (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD);
 [X]FR1538231  (EHRENREICH & CIE A);
 [X]GB1000622  (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.