Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0300114

EP0300114 - Catheter device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.1993
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haindl, Hans, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 39
30974 Wennigsen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/08]For all designated states
Haindl, Hans, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 39
D-30974 Wennigsen / DE
Former [1989/04]For all designated states
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Postfach 120
D-34209 Melsungen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Haindl, Hans, Dr.
Hauptstrasse 39
D-3015 Wennigsen / DE
02 / Fuchs, Jürgen
Wolfhager Strasse 45
D-3501 Emstal-Sand / DE
[1992/24]
Former [1989/04]01 / Haindl, Hans, Dr.
Am Forstgarten 22
D-3508 Melsungen / DE
02 / Fuchs, Jürgen
Wolfhager Strasse 45
D-3501 Emstal-Sand / DE
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/08]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Former [1989/04]Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date88100702.520.01.1988
[1989/04]
Priority number, dateDE1987372129927.06.1987         Original published format: DE 3721299
[1989/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0300114
Date:25.01.1989
Language:DE
[1989/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0300114
Date:01.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0300114
Date:10.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.1988
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/00, A61M5/14
[1989/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/04]
TitleGerman:Kathetervorrichtung[1989/04]
English:Catheter device[1989/04]
French:Dispositif de cathéter[1989/04]
Examination procedure26.07.1989Examination requested  [1989/38]
03.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.12.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.03.1992Fee for grant paid
04.03.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.03.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR10.06.1992
AT20.01.1993
GB20.01.1993
ES21.01.1993
SE21.01.1993
BE31.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
[2004/37]
Former [2000/04]GR10.06.1992
AT20.01.1993
GB20.01.1993
SE21.01.1993
BE31.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
Former [1994/32]AT20.01.1993
GB20.01.1993
SE21.01.1993
BE31.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
Former [1994/04]GB20.01.1993
SE21.01.1993
BE31.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
Former [1994/02]GB20.01.1993
SE21.01.1993
BE31.01.1993
Former [1993/51]SE21.01.1993
BE31.01.1993
Former [1993/46]SE21.01.1993
Documents cited:Search[X]DE395389  ;
 [Y]US3841308  ;
 [A]US1920006  ;
 [A]DE3201954  ;
 [A]US3799172  ;
 [A]GB2044109
ExaminationDE3540946