Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0279191

EP0279191 - Device for contactless measurement of remission [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.1997
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.1997 [1997/27]
Applicant(s)For:CH  DE  LI 
Firma Carl Zeiss
D-73446 Oberkochen / DE
For:GB 
CARL ZEISS-STIFTUNG HANDELND ALS CARL ZEISS
D-89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
[1991/11]
Former [1988/34]For:CH  DE  LI 
Firma Carl Zeiss
D-7920 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
For:GB 
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as CARL ZEISS
D-7920 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hohberg, Gerhard, Dr.
Hornbergstrasse 13
D-7080 Aalen / DE
02 / Gerlinger, Hermann, Dr.
Welfenstrasse 6
D-7080 Aalen-Ebnat / DE
[1988/34]
Application number, filing date88100728.020.01.1988
[1988/34]
Priority number, dateDE1987370172122.01.1987         Original published format: DE 3701721
[1988/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0279191
Date:24.08.1988
Language:DE
[1988/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0279191
Date:04.10.1989
Language:DE
[1989/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0279191
Date:10.07.1996
Language:DE
[1996/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.1989
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/86, G01N21/47
[1988/34]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [1988/34]
TitleGerman:Gerät zur berührungslosen Remissionsmessung[1988/34]
English:Device for contactless measurement of remission[1988/34]
French:Dispositif pour la mesure sans contact de la rémission[1988/34]
Examination procedure17.03.1990Examination requested  [1990/20]
02.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.1996Fee for grant paid
13.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.04.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60014132  ;
 [AP]EP0209860  ;
 [Y]EP0099024  ;
 [Y]US3526777  ;
 [Y]DE8417621U  ;
 [Y]GB2066452  ;
 [Y]US4022534  ;
 [A]DE1902101  ;
 [A]US3718399  ;
 [A]US3999864  ;
 [A]US4379225
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN. Band 9, Nr. 129 (P-361)(1852) 5 June 1985; & JP-A-60 014 132 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU K.K.) 24-01-1985, & JP60014132 A 19850605
ExaminationJP60014132
 US4029420
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Band 9, Nr. 129 (P-361)(1852) 05.06.85 & JP-A-60014132, & JP60014132 A 00000000
    - Klein, Furtak: "Optics", 1986, S.219-222