Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0276853

EP0276853 - An active-matrix liquid crystal color display panel having a triangular pixel arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.1995
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.1995 [1995/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1990/33]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1988/31]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Noguchi, Kesao c/o NEC Corporation
33-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
[1988/31]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/31]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date88101242.128.01.1988
[1988/31]
Priority number, dateJP1987001910028.01.1987         Original published format: JP 1910087
[1988/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0276853
Date:03.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0276853
Date:07.02.1990
Language:EN
[1990/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0276853
Date:14.12.1994
Language:EN
[1994/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.12.1989
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/133
[1988/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1988/31]
TitleGerman:Farbflüssigkristall-Anzeigetafel mit aktiver Matrix und dreieckiger Bildelementanordnung[1988/31]
English:An active-matrix liquid crystal color display panel having a triangular pixel arrangement[1988/31]
French:Panneau d'affichage en couleurs à cristal liquide possédant un agencement d'éléments d'image triangulaires[1988/31]
Examination procedure28.01.1988Examination requested  [1988/31]
31.08.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.11.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1994Fee for grant paid
15.09.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
22.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
19.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
18.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60207118  ;
 [Y]EP0189214  ;
 [Y]EP0182645  ;
 [A]FR2582431
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 68 (P-437)[2125], 18th March 1986; & JP-A-60 207 118 (TOSHIBA K.K.) 18-10-1985, & JP60207118 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 246 (P-393)[1969], 3th October 1985; JP-A-60 097 322 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 31-05-1985