blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0280077

EP0280077 - Tooth-pastes and cleansing agent for tooth-pastes based on dicalciumphosphat-dihydrat and a preparation method for such a cleansing-agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.11.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.12.1992 [1992/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dany, Franz-Josef, Dr.
Heddinghovener Strasse 47
D-5042 Erftstadt / DE
02 / Klassen, Horst, Dr.
Hellenthaler Weg 11
D-5042 Erftstadt / DE
03 / Adrian, Renate
Grosse Ölbruchstrasse 29
D-5030 Hürth / DE
04 / Prell, Hedwig
Dr.-Krauss-Strasse 9
D-5030 Hürth / DE
05 / Kalteyer, Gerhard
Laurentiusstrasse 8
D-5042 Erftstadt / DE
[1988/35]
Application number, filing date88101513.503.02.1988
[1988/35]
Priority number, dateDE1987370584524.02.1987         Original published format: DE 3705845
[1988/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0280077
Date:31.08.1988
Language:DE
[1988/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0280077
Date:11.10.1989
Language:DE
[1989/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0280077
Date:08.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61K7/16, C01B25/32
[1989/45]
CPC:
A61K8/24 (EP,US); A61Q11/00 (EP,US); C01B25/322 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1988/35]A61K7/16
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [1988/35]
TitleGerman:Zahnpasten sowie Putzkörper für Zahnpasten auf Basis Dicalciumphosphat-dihydrat und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung solcher Putzkörper[1988/35]
English:Tooth-pastes and cleansing agent for tooth-pastes based on dicalciumphosphat-dihydrat and a preparation method for such a cleansing-agent[1988/35]
French:Pâte dentifrice ainsi qu'un agent de nettoyage pour dentifrice à base de dihydrate de phosphate dicalcique et procédé de préparation d'un tel agent[1988/35]
Examination procedure24.10.1989Examination requested  [1989/51]
22.05.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.1991Fee for grant paid
04.09.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.10.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0040938  (MONSANTO CO [US]);
 [AD]DE2648061  (HOECHST AG);
 [A]EP0017784  (HOECHST AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.