Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0293550

EP0293550 - Paper size selection apparatus for use in copier machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2000
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINOLTA CO., LTD.
Osaka Kokusai Building, 3-13, 2-chome, Azuchi-Machi, Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
[1997/09]
Former [1988/49]For all designated states
Minolta Camera Kabushiki Kaisha
Osaka Kokusai Building 30, Azuchi-machi 2-chome
Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Masazumi Minolta Camera Kabushiki Kaisha
Osaka Kokusai Building, 2-30 Azuchi-machi
Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
[1988/49]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/49]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date88101716.405.02.1988
[1988/49]
Priority number, dateJP1987014187405.06.1987         Original published format: JP 14187487
[1988/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0293550
Date:07.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0293550
Date:25.07.1990
Language:EN
[1990/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0293550
Date:28.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.1990
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/00
[1988/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1988/49]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Auswahl der Papiergrösse, verwendbar in Kopiermaschinen[1988/49]
English:Paper size selection apparatus for use in copier machines[1988/49]
French:Dispositif de sélection de la taille du papier utilisable dans les machines à copier[1988/49]
Examination procedure05.02.1988Examination requested  [1988/49]
21.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.1993Date of oral proceedings
13.12.1993Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.12.1993Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.1999Fee for grant paid
06.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination31.01.1994Appeal received No.  T0390/94
21.04.1994Statement of grounds filed
10.07.1997Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
10.07.1997Date of oral proceedings
24.07.1997Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)29.04.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
18.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
18.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
17.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
16.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
18.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
16.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 11
18.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[A]JP61080172  ;
 [A]JP57167040  ;
 [A]DE3622403
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 254 (P-492)[2310], 30th August 1986; & JP-A-61 080 172 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 23-04-1986, & JP61080172 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 10 (P-168)[1155], 14th January 1983; & JP-A-57 167 040 (CANON K.K.) 14-10-1982, & JP57167040 A 00000000