blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0280099

EP0280099 - Suspension of running gear for railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.1991
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.04.1991 [1991/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Waggonfabrik Talbot
Jülicher Strasse 213-237
52070 Aachen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]For all designated states
Waggonfabrik Talbot
Jülicher Strasse 213-237
D-52070 Aachen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Collienne, Franz-Joseph
Oestr. 95
B-4700 Eupen / BE
02 / Corsten, Leonhard
Max-Planck-Strasse 4
D-5120 Herzogenrath / DE
03 / Jakob, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing.
Schönrathstrasse 27
D-5100 Aachen / DE
04 / Nicolin, Johannes, Dr.-Ing.
Kohlweg 2
D-5100 Aachen / DE
05 / Müller, Lothar, Dr.-Ing.
Bremer Strasse 24D
D-3016 Seelze / DE
[1988/35]
Representative(s)Brinkmann & Partner
Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Am Seestern 8
40547 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70
D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date88101723.006.02.1988
[1988/35]
Priority number, dateDE1987370449213.02.1987         Original published format: DE 3704492
[1988/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0280099
Date:31.08.1988
Language:DE
[1988/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0280099
Date:09.05.1990
Language:DE
[1990/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.1988
ClassificationIPC:B61F5/30, B61F5/32
[1988/35]
CPC:
B61F5/305 (EP); B61F5/308 (EP); B61F5/32 (EP);
B60G2202/12 (EP); B60G2202/1524 (EP); B60G2202/23 (EP);
B60G2500/20 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1988/35]
TitleGerman:Laufwerkfederung für Schienenfahrzeuge[1988/35]
English:Suspension of running gear for railway vehicles[1988/35]
French:Suspension de train de roues pour véhicules ferroviaires[1988/35]
Examination procedure02.08.1988Examination requested  [1988/39]
09.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1989Fee for grant paid
28.10.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.02.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1861536U  (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]);
 [A]DE1142895  (CLOUTH RHEIN GUMMIWARENFABRIK);
 [A]DE1230834  (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH);
 [A]DE2105162  ;
 [A]FR2171117  (TALBOT WAGGONFAB [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.