Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0306598

EP0306598 - Electronically programmable remote control access systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.1991
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.1991 [1991/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CLIFFORD ELECTRONICS, INC.
20750 Lassen Street Chatsworth
California 91311 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]For all designated states
CLIFFORD ELECTRONICS, INC.
20750 Lassen Street
Chatsworth California 91311 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Drori, Ze-ev
20750 Lassen Street
Chatsworth California 91311 / US
[1989/11]
Representative(s)Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH
Postfach 3055
D-90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date88101797.408.02.1988
[1989/11]
Priority number, dateUS1987009439508.09.1987         Original published format: US 94395
[1989/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0306598
Date:15.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0306598
Date:23.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.1989
ClassificationInternational:G07C9/00, E05B49/00
[1989/31]
Former International [1989/11]G07C9/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1989/11]
TitleGerman:Elektronisch programmierbare und auf Abstand steuerbare Zugangssysteme[1989/11]
English:Electronically programmable remote control access systems[1989/11]
French:Systèmes d'accès avec commande à distance électroniquement programmables[1989/11]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure11.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/29]
29.08.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/12]
17.10.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1991/12]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.199003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8501980  (UNIVERSAL PHOTONICS INC [US]);
 [Y]GB2116808  (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP);
 [Y]US4148012  (BAUMP PAUL A, et al);
 [Y]EP0139059  (CARTER JOHN ROBERT [GB], et al);
 [Y]US4245212  (CIRIMELE FRANK R);
 [A]US4525805  (PROSAN RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]US4236068  (WALTON CHARLES A [US]);
 [A]EP0162171  (GENEST LEONARD JOSEPH [US])