blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0280167

EP0280167 - Use of lipophile anthracyclines for the secondary treatment of anthracycline-resistant tumors, composition containing a lipophile anthracycline and preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.1990
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.1990Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 31.10.1990 [1990/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 1140
35001 Marburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]For all designated states
BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 1140
D-35001 Marburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hoffmann, Dieter, Dr.
Im Stetefeld 6
D-3551 Lahntal / DE
02 / Kraemer, Hans Peter, Dr.
Birkenweg 16
D-3550 Marburg / DE
03 / Hermentin, Peter, Dr.
Barfüssertor 30
D-3550 Marburg / DE
04 / Gerken, Manfred, Dr.
Wannkopfstrasse 12
D-3550 Marburg / DE
05 / Kolar, Cenek, Dr.
Deutschhausstrasse 20
D-3550 Marburg / DE
[1988/35]
Representative(s)Klein, Otto, et al
Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, SU Patente
84504 Burgkirchen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/03]Klein, Otto, Dr., et al
Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, Patentbüro
D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE
Former [1988/35]Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr.
Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date88102269.317.02.1988
[1988/35]
Priority number, dateDE1987370617526.02.1987         Original published format: DE 3706175
[1988/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0280167
Date:31.08.1988
Language:DE
[1988/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0280167
Date:04.10.1989
Language:DE
[1989/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.1989
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/645, A61K31/12
[1988/35]
CPC:
C07H15/252 (EP); A61K31/65 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/35]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von lipophilen Anthracyclinen zur Behandlung "sekundär" anthracyclin-resistenter Tumoren, Mittel enthaltend ein lipophiles Anthracyclin und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1988/35]
English:Use of lipophile anthracyclines for the secondary treatment of anthracycline-resistant tumors, composition containing a lipophile anthracycline and preparation thereof[1988/35]
French:Utilisation d'anthracyclines lipophiles pour le traitement secondaire de tumeurs résistantes aux anthracyclines, produit contenant une anthracycline lipophile et son procédé de préparation[1988/35]
File destroyed:28.06.1996
Examination procedure02.04.1990Examination requested  [1990/23]
06.09.1990Application withdrawn by applicant  [1990/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO8605983  (UNIV TENNESSEE RES CORP [US]);
 [Y]EP0022574  (SANRAKU OCEAN CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0062327  (SANRAKU OCEAN CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0063776  (SANRAKU OCEAN CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0078447  (SANRAKU OCEAN CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0131181  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [E]EP0270992  (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE])
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. Band 92, Nr. 12, 24 März 1980, Seite 21; Spalte 1, ref. Nr. 104050, D. KESSEL: "Biologic properties of three anthracyclines as a function of lipophilicity"; & Biochem. Pharmacol. 1979, 28(19), 3028-3030
 [AP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. Band 107, Nr. 25 21 Dezember 1987, Seite 18, Spalte 2; Ref. Nr. 228433; & Pharmacochem. Libr. 1987, 10, 138-140; L. FACCHETTI et al.: "Lipophilic character and biological activity of anthracyclines".
 [Y]  - JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS. Band 34, Nr. 12, Dezember 1981, Seiten 1596-1607 (2321); MATSUZAWA et al.: "Structure activity relationships of anthracyclines relatives to cytotoxicity...".
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.