Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0280238

EP0280238 - Silver halide color photographic photosensitive materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  13.04.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/35]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Tadashi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
02 / Takahashi, Osamu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa / JP
[1988/35]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1988/35]Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date88102576.122.02.1988
[1988/35]
Priority number, dateJP1987003982523.02.1987         Original published format: JP 3982587
JP1987015894826.06.1987         Original published format: JP 15894887
[1988/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0280238
Date:31.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0280238
Date:06.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0280238
Date:04.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0280238
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.1989
ClassificationInternational:G03C7/26, G03C7/32
[1988/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1988/35]
TitleGerman:Farbphotographische photoempfindliche Silberhalogenidmaterialien[1988/35]
English:Silver halide color photographic photosensitive materials[1988/35]
French:Matériaux photographiques couleur à l'halogénure d'argent photosensible[1988/35]
Examination procedure20.02.1990Examination requested  [1990/16]
23.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
07.08.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.02.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.1993Fee for grant paid
30.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.11.1993  22.11.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Agfa-Gevaert AG
-Patentabteilung- Postfach
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1993/52]
Opponent(s)01  05.11.1993  22.11.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Agfa-Gevaert AG
-Patentabteilung- Postfach
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
09.06.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.12.1994Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.12.1994Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
10.02.1995Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
30.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.10.1996Date of oral proceedings
25.10.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.10.1996Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.08.2000Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.01.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
13.03.2001Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition02.12.1996Appeal received No.  T1059/96
23.01.1997Statement of grounds filed
17.08.2000Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
17.08.2000Date of oral proceedings
25.08.2000Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
26.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL01.09.1994
FR31.10.1994
[1995/28]
Former [1995/13]NL01.09.1994
Documents cited:Search[X]US4120725  (NAKAZYO KIYOSHI, et al);
 [YD]EP0199290  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]);
 [Y]US4639413  (KAWAGISHI TOSHIO [JP], et al);
 [XE]EP0256537  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP])
 [A]  RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, December 1978, pages 22-31, abstract no. 17643, Idustrial Opportunities Ltd., Havant, Hampshire, GB; "Photographic silver halide emulsions, preparations, addenda, processing and systems",
 [X]  RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 195, July 1980, pages 301-310, abstract no. 19551, Industrial Opportunities Ltd., Havant, Hampshire, GB; "Photographic applications of latices",