Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0281857

EP0281857 - Method for securing elastic elements - strands or tapes - on a sheet, and use of this method in making elasticized portions of a web [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.1994
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.1994 [1994/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H.B. FULLER LICENSING & FINANCING, INC.
1100 North Market Street, Suite 780
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/13]For all designated states
H.B. FULLER LICENSING & FINANCING, INC.
1100 North Market Street, Suite 780
Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US
Former [1988/37]For all designated states
H.B. Fuller GmbH
Postfach 20 50
D-21310 Lüneburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Werenicz, Harald
Goethestrasse 28
D-2120 Lüneburg / DE
[1988/37]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/37]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
D-22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date88102782.525.02.1988
[1988/37]
Priority number, dateDE1987370734907.03.1987         Original published format: DE 3707349
DE1987374041028.11.1987         Original published format: DE 3740410
[1988/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0281857
Date:14.09.1988
Language:DE
[1988/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0281857
Date:25.07.1990
Language:DE
[1990/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0281857
Date:21.07.1993
Language:DE
[1993/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.1990
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15, A41B13/04, B32B7/12, C09J5/00
[1990/29]
Former International [1988/37]A41B13/02
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/37]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum dauerhaften Verbinden von dehnbaren faden- oder bändchenförmigen Elementen auf einem flächigem Substrat sowie Anwendung desselben zur Herstellung von gerüschten Folienbahnabschnitten[1988/37]
English:Method for securing elastic elements - strands or tapes - on a sheet, and use of this method in making elasticized portions of a web[1988/37]
French:Procédé de fixation d'éléments extensibles sous forme de fils de bandes sur un support en feuille et utilisation dudit procédé pour la fabrication d'éléments de feuille froncés[1988/37]
Examination procedure24.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/38]
06.12.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.11.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
14.01.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
21.01.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.1993Fee for grant paid
26.03.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28]
Request for further processing for:18.12.1992Request for further processing filed
18.12.1992Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.1993Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
18.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3447442  (PAPER CONVERTING MACHINE CO [US]);
 [AD]DE3347294  (SCHICKEDANZ VER PAPIERWERK);
 [A]DE3016197  (WINKLER DUENNEBIER KG MASCH [DE])
by applicantDE3447442
 DE3347294