Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0283882

EP0283882 - Cloning of malaria-specific DNA sequences: isolation of the 140 Kd protein gene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chiron Behring GmbH & Co.
Postfach 1630
35006 Marburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/42]For all designated states
Chiron Behring Gmbh & Co.
Postfach 1630
35006 Marburg / DE
Former [1988/39]For all designated states
BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft
Postfach 1140
D-35001 Marburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Knapp, Bernhard, Dr.
Baumgarten 9
D-3550 Marburg-Schröck / DE
02 / Hundt, Erika, Dr.
Zum Hirtzborn 8
D-3550 Marburg-Wehrshausen / DE
03 / Enders, Burghard, Dr.
Oberer Eichweg 12
D-3550 Marburg / DE
04 / Küpper, Hans, Dr.
Biegenstrasse 39
D-3550 Marburg / DE
[1988/39]
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/10]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1993/37](deleted)
...
Former [1988/39]Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr. , et al
Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA
D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date88103949.912.03.1988
[1988/39]
Priority number, dateDE1987370878318.03.1987         Original published format: DE 3708783
DE1987374105704.12.1987         Original published format: DE 3741057
[1988/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0283882
Date:28.09.1988
Language:DE
[1988/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0283882
Date:19.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.1988
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/30, A61K39/002, C07K14/445, A61K39/395
[1998/51]
Former International [1988/39]C12N15/00, A61K39/015, C07K15/00, A61K39/395
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/39]
TitleGerman:Klonierung von Malaria-spezifischen DNA-Sequenzen:Isolierung des Gens für das 140 kd Protein[1988/39]
English:Cloning of malaria-specific DNA sequences: isolation of the 140 Kd protein gene[1988/39]
French:Clonage de séquences d'ADN spécifiques pour le paludisme: isolation du gène de la protéine 140 Kd[1988/39]
Examination procedure18.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/20]
22.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
24.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.08.1999Fee for grant paid
11.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Request for further processing for:24.12.1996Request for further processing filed
24.12.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.01.1997Decision despatched
24.03.1994Request for further processing filed
08.04.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
25.04.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
01.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
24.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 11
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES19.01.2000
FR19.01.2000
GB19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
IT19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
LU12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
[2007/52]
Former [2006/14]ES19.01.2000
FR19.01.2000
GB19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
LU12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
Former [2005/23]ES19.01.2000
GB19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
LU12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2004/07]ES19.01.2000
GB19.01.2000
GR19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2003/07]ES19.01.2000
GB19.01.2000
NL19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2002/24]ES19.01.2000
GB19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2002/23]GB19.01.2000
SE19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2002/02]GB19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
CH31.03.2000
LI31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2001/37]GB19.01.2000
AT12.03.2000
BE31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2001/11]GB19.01.2000
BE31.03.2000
FR16.06.2000
Former [2001/09]GB19.01.2000
FR16.06.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]WO8402917  (INST MEDICAL W & E HALL [AU]);
 [Y]WO8503725  (BIOGEN NV [NL]);
 [A]WO8604922  (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al)
 [Y]  - BULLETIN OF THE WORLD HEALTH ORGANIZATION, Band 61, Nr. 1, 1983, Seiten 105-112; L. RODRIGUEZ DA SILVA et al.: "Plasmodium falciparum polypeptides released during in vitro cultivation"
 [A]  - EXPERIENTIA, Band 42, Nr. 1, Januar 1986, Seiten 87,99, Birkenhäuser Verlag, Basel, CH; M. McGARVEY et al.: "Expression and production in E.coli of merozoite stage-specific polypeptide antigens from Plasmodium falciparum"
 [A]  - THE EMBO JOURNAL, Band 6, Nr. 2, Februar 1987, Seiten 493-499, Irl. Press Ltd., Eynsham, Oxford, GB; F. ARDESHIR et al.: "A 75 kd merozoite surface protein of Plasmodium falciparum which is related to the 70 kd heat-shock proteins"
 [A]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, Band 84, Nr. 5, März 1987, Seiten 1399-1403, Washington, DC, US; L. ASLUND et al.: "Synthetic gene construct expressing a repeated and highly immunogenic epitope of the Plasmodium falciparum antigen Pf155"