Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0286082 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0286082



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 652
10.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.10.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.10.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
30.09.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 5
09.07.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.06.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.06.1997 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.06.1997 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.06.1997 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 1
25.03.1997 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
25.03.1997 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
25.03.1997 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
25.03.1997 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
25.03.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.03.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.03.1997 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
05.03.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.03.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.03.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.02.1997 Claims Appeal 2
27.02.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
25.02.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.02.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.02.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.09.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.09.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.09.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
09.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
08.08.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.08.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.08.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
02.08.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.08.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.08.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
02.08.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 3
31.07.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.07.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
19.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
19.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
28.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.06.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
14.06.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
14.06.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
14.06.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
11.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.06.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.06.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
18.04.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.04.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.04.1996 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
03.04.1996 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
29.03.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.03.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.03.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
24.11.1995 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.11.1995 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.11.1995 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
17.10.1995 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.10.1995 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
20.09.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.09.1995 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
08.09.1995 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
20.07.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.07.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.07.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.07.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.07.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.07.1995 Annex to a communication Opposition 17
11.07.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
11.07.1995 Claims Opposition 2
11.07.1995 Claims Opposition 2
11.07.1995 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.1995 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.1995 Claims Opposition 2
11.07.1995 Claims Opposition 2
11.07.1995 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
11.07.1995 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
11.07.1995 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
11.07.1995 Means of redress Opposition 1
11.07.1995 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
03.07.1995 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
09.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
18.04.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
24.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
18.03.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.03.1995 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
17.03.1995 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
14.03.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.03.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.03.1995 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.03.1995 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.03.1995 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
07.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
07.03.1995 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
10.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.1995 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.02.1995 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.12.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
21.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
21.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.11.1994 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
11.11.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.10.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
18.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.10.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.10.1994 Claims Opposition 2
07.10.1994 Claims Opposition 3
07.10.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
07.10.1994 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
07.10.1994 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 6
26.07.1994 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
20.03.1994 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.03.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 7
10.03.1994 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
27.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.01.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.01.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
08.01.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.01.1994 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.01.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
07.01.1994 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
27.12.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.12.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.12.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.12.1993 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
14.12.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.12.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.12.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.11.1993 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
16.11.1993 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
10.11.1993 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
22.10.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.10.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
18.10.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.08.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.08.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.05.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.05.1993 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.05.1993 Communication of termination of the opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings for one opponent (further opponents present) Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.04.1993 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.02.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.02.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.02.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
05.02.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
05.02.1993 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.02.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.02.1993 N/A Opposition 1
01.02.1993 N/A Opposition 1
01.02.1993 N/A Opposition 1
25.01.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.01.1993 Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) Opposition 1
15.01.1993 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
15.01.1993 Request for documents Opposition 1
15.01.1993 Request for documents Opposition 1
13.01.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.01.1993 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.12.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
21.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
21.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
21.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
21.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
21.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
19.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
19.12.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
19.12.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
19.12.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
18.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
18.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
15.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.12.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
26.03.1992 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
11.02.1992 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
10.02.1992 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 1
22.11.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
22.11.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
22.11.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.09.1991 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
04.09.1991 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.07.1991 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.07.1991 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
20.06.1991 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
06.05.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.04.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.04.1991 Claims Search / examination 4
30.04.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
30.04.1991 Description Search / examination 16
30.04.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.04.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.02.1991 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
27.11.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
27.11.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.07.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.03.1989 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.01.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.01.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
31.08.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.07.1988 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.07.1988 Priority document Search / examination 28
19.07.1988 Translation of priority document Search / examination 29
19.05.1988 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Claims Search / examination 4
07.04.1988 Description Search / examination 16
07.04.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.1988 Drawings Search / examination 5
07.04.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5