blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0287002

EP0287002 - Engraved roller for an offset inking device, and manufacturing method for such an engraved roller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.04.2000
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, IT, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft
Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
[2000/09]
Former [1996/45]For all designated states
KOENIG & BAUER-ALBERT AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4
97080 Würzburg / DE
Former [1988/42]For all designated states
Albert-Frankenthal AG
Postfach 11 22, Johann-Klein-Strasse 1
D-67225 Frankenthal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Herb, Rudolf
Richard-Wagner-Strasse 17
D-6712 Bobenheim / DE
[1988/42]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[1996/40]
Former [1988/42]Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1
D-86150 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date88105687.309.04.1988
[1988/42]
Priority number, dateDE1987371302716.04.1987         Original published format: DE 3713027
[1988/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0287002
Date:19.10.1988
Language:DE
[1988/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0287002
Date:28.06.1989
Language:DE
[1989/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0287002
Date:02.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:B41F31/26, B41N7/00
[1988/42]
CPC:
B41N7/06 (EP); B41N2207/02 (EP); B41N2207/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1988/42]
TitleGerman:Rasterwalze für ein Offsetfarbwerk sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer derartigen Rasterwalze[1988/42]
English:Engraved roller for an offset inking device, and manufacturing method for such an engraved roller[1988/42]
French:Rouleau tramé dans un dispositif d'encrage offset et procédé de fabrication d'un tel rouleau tramé[1988/42]
Examination procedure17.05.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
21.06.1989Examination requested  [1989/34]
16.11.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.1989Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
17.03.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
07.09.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.1991Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.1994Fee for grant paid
07.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination27.06.1991Appeal received No.  T0764/91
24.09.1991Statement of grounds filed
15.04.1994Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.07.1995  04.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
M.A.N.- ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft, Offenbach/Main
Postfach 10 00 96
D-86135 Augsburg / DE
 02  31.07.1995  10.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Praxair Technology, Inc.
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Ct. 06810-5113 / US
Opponents representative
Schwan, Gerhard
Schwan Schwan Schorer
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/39]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.1995  04.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
M.A.N.- ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft, Offenbach/Main
Postfach 10 00 96
D-86135 Augsburg / DE
 02  31.07.1995  10.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Praxair Technology, Inc.
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Ct. 06810-5113 / US
Opponents representative
Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Elfenstrasse 32
D-81739 München / DE
Former [1995/38]
Opponent(s)01  25.07.1995  04.08.1995  ADMISSIBLE
M.A.N.- ROLAND Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft, Offenbach/Main
Postfach 10 00 96
D-86135 Augsburg / DE
06.09.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.03.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.02.1997Date of oral proceedings
25.02.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
25.02.1997Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
08.02.2000Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/23]
Appeal following opposition05.05.1997Appeal received No.  T0506/97
07.07.1997Statement of grounds filed
08.02.2000Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
08.02.2000Date of oral proceedings
14.02.2000Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
08.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2000/52]CH02.11.1994
IT02.11.1994
LI02.11.1994
Former [1999/42]IT02.11.1994
Documents cited:Search[X]US4637310  (SATO MASAYONSHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]GB2049102  (CSI CORP);
 [X]US4537127  (FADNER THOMAS A [US], et al);
 [A]DE3525045  (PAUL SAUER DRUCKWALZENFABRIKEN [DE]);
 [A]US4601242  (FADNER THOMAS A [US]);
 [A]DE3608286  (HEINZEL WINFRIED);
 [AD]DE3117341  (FRANKENTHAL AG ALBERT [DE])
ExaminationUS4603634
    - Bundespatentgericht Beschluss 9W(Pat)111/8 vom 10.01.90
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.