Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0287002 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0287002



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 379
19.04.2000 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
18.04.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.04.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.04.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.02.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.02.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.02.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.02.2000 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
08.02.2000 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
18.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
18.01.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 2
18.01.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
14.01.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
14.01.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.01.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
12.01.2000 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
07.01.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
05.01.2000 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 12
05.01.2000 Claims Appeal 2
05.01.2000 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.06.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.06.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.06.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
18.06.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.06.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.06.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.06.1999 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
15.06.1999 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
31.05.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
31.05.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
31.05.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.01.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
16.02.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
16.02.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
02.02.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
28.11.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.11.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.11.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
21.11.1997 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
06.11.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.11.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
30.10.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
22.07.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.07.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
10.07.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
07.07.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
22.05.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.05.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.05.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
07.05.1997 Claims Appeal 2
07.05.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.05.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
07.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.03.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
01.03.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.03.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
25.02.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 4
25.02.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
25.02.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.02.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.02.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
25.02.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 12
25.02.1997 Means of redress Opposition 1
25.02.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
14.02.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
19.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
19.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.12.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.12.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.09.1996 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
16.09.1996 Request for assignment Search / examination 1
13.09.1996 Request for assignment Search / examination 2
12.09.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
09.09.1996 Request for assignment Search / examination 14
26.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.08.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
20.08.1996 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
20.08.1996 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Search / examination 1
20.08.1996 Notification of termination of representative's authorisation Opposition 1
09.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.08.1996 Submission concerning representation Opposition 1
07.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
06.08.1996 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.08.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.08.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.08.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.08.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.08.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.08.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
01.08.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
01.08.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
01.08.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
01.08.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.07.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.07.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
27.06.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.03.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
28.02.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
27.02.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.01.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Opposition 1
23.12.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.09.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.09.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
06.09.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.08.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.08.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.08.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
31.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
31.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
25.07.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
22.09.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.07.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.07.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
07.07.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
29.04.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 17
28.04.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.04.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
21.02.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.02.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.08.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
05.03.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
27.12.1991 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.12.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
19.12.1991 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
14.11.1991 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
24.09.1991 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
10.07.1991 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
27.06.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.05.1991 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
06.05.1991 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 8
25.04.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
07.09.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
03.09.1990 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.08.1990 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.07.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.03.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
17.03.1990 Description Search / examination 4
17.03.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.11.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
28.08.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
17.05.1989 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
17.05.1989 Claims Search / examination 3
02.05.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.05.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
07.09.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.04.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.04.1988 Authorisation Search / examination 1
09.04.1988 Claims Search / examination 3
09.04.1988 Description Search / examination 9
09.04.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.04.1988 Drawings Search / examination 2
09.04.1988 Priority document Search / examination 17
09.04.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5