blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0294701

EP0294701 - Photoanalysis apparatus with means for correcting flow rate of fluid carrying particles and/or position of applied light beam for examination and photoanalysis method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.1993
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1988/50]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyake, Ryo Tsukuba Hausu 4-507
2625-3 Shimoinayoshi Chiyodamura Niihari-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Ohki, Hiroshi
8-1, Migimomi
Tsuchiura-shi / JP
03 / Yamazaki, Isao Niihariryo
3602, Shimoinayoshi Chiyodamura Niihari-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
[1988/50]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo, et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [1988/50]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date88108784.501.06.1988
[1988/50]
Priority number, dateJP1987014277508.06.1987         Original published format: JP 14277587
[1988/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0294701
Date:14.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0294701
Date:21.02.1990
Language:EN
[1990/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0294701
Date:02.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.1990
ClassificationIPC:G01N15/14, G01N21/05
[1988/50]
CPC:
G01N15/1404 (EP,US); G01N15/1459 (EP); G01N15/1409 (EP,US);
G01N2015/1452 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1988/50]
TitleGerman:Photoanalysegerät mit Mitteln zum Korrigieren des Strömens der die Teilchen tragenden Flüssigkeit und/oder der Lage des angewandten Lichtstrahles und zugehörige Methode[1992/36]
English:Photoanalysis apparatus with means for correcting flow rate of fluid carrying particles and/or position of applied light beam for examination and photoanalysis method therefor[1988/50]
French:Appareil de photoanalyse avec des moyens pour corriger le flux du fluide transportant les particules et/ou la position du faisceau lumineux employé et méthode correspondante[1988/50]
Former [1988/50]Photoanalysegerät mit Mitteln zum Korrigieren des Strömens der die Teilchen trägenden Flüssigkeit und/oder der Lage des angewandten Lichtstrahles und zugehörige Methode
Examination procedure01.06.1988Examination requested  [1988/50]
10.07.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.03.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.1992Fee for grant paid
12.06.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.06.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
23.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3873204  (FRIEDMAN MITCHELL, et al);
 [A]US4606631  (ANNO GOUSUKE [JP], et al);
 [A]EP0210343  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US])
 [AD]  - REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRU- MENTS, vol. 46, no. 8, August 1975, New York W.C. EISER et al. "Simple flowmicrophotometer for rapid cellpopulation analysis" pages 1021-1024
 [AD]  - SCIENCE, vol. 150, October 1965, Washington L.A. KAMENTSKY et al. "Spectrophotometer: New Instrument for Ultrarapid CellAnalysis" pages 630-631
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.