Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0306623

EP0306623 - Electric steam iron [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.1993
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 01.09.1993 [1993/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Krups GmbH & Co. KG
Heresbachstrasse 29
42719 Solingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/05]For all designated states
Robert Krups GmbH & Co. KG
Heresbachstrasse 29
D-42719 Solingen / DE
Former [1989/11]For all designated states
ROBERT KRUPS STIFTUNG & CO. KG.
Heresbachstrasse 29
D-42719 Solingen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mahlich, Gotthard Chr.
Am Frosthaus 2
D-6242 Kronberg / DE
02 / Borgmann, Michael
Dültgenstaler Strasse 14
D-5650 Solingen / DE
[1989/11]
Representative(s)Buse, Karl Georg , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34
42275 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]Buse, Karl Georg, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse, Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel, Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Kleiner Werth 34
D-42275 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date88108964.304.06.1988
[1989/11]
Priority number, dateDE1987372980005.09.1987         Original published format: DE 3729800
[1989/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0306623
Date:15.03.1989
Language:DE
[1989/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0306623
Date:09.09.1992
Language:DE
[1992/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.1988
ClassificationInternational:D06F75/14
[1989/11]
Designated contracting statesCH,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1992/40]
Former [1989/11]CH,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elektrisch betriebenes Dampfbügeleisen[1989/11]
English:Electric steam iron[1989/11]
French:Fer à repasser à vapeur électrique[1989/11]
MiscellaneousEPB 1992/37: Teilanmeldung 92103138.1 eingereicht am 04/06/88
EPB 1992/37: Divisional application 92103138.1 filed on 04/06/88
EPB 1992/37: Demande divisionnaire 92103138.1 déposée le 04/06/88
Examination procedure20.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/16]
02.08.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.02.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
23.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.06.1992Fee for grant paid
04.06.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP92103138.1  / EP0489714
Opposition(s)10.06.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE3033964  ;
 [Y]DE3014493  ;
 [A]US3949499  (SCHAEFFER ROBERT L, et al);
 [A]DE2242402  ;
 [A]GB1022697
ExaminationJPS60160997
 US4400279
 US4565019