Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0298357

EP0298357 - Two-compartment container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.1993
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.03.1993 [1993/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
40191 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/02]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stöffler, Albert
Nördlingerstrasse 28
D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / Mehl, Dietholf
Marschallstrasse 32
D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE
03 / Schneider, Hans
Landwehr 1
D-4056 Schwalmtal / DE
[1989/02]
Application number, filing date88110363.429.06.1988
[1989/02]
Priority number, dateDE1987372237107.07.1987         Original published format: DE 3722371
[1989/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0298357
Date:11.01.1989
Language:DE
[1989/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0298357
Date:31.01.1990
Language:DE
[1990/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0298357
Date:08.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1989
ClassificationInternational:B65D25/08, B65D81/32
[1990/06]
Former International [1989/02]B65D81/32
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/02]
TitleGerman:Zweikammerbehälter[1989/02]
English:Two-compartment container[1989/02]
French:Récipient à deux compartiments[1989/02]
Examination procedure19.02.1990Examination requested  [1990/16]
23.05.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.1991Fee for grant paid
21.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.01.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3410444  (BRUNO MORANE);
 [A]FR2590235  (OREAL [FR]);
 [A]FR2569666  (OREAL [FR]);
 [A]US4465183  (SAITO TADAO [JP], et al);
 [AD]DE3528525  (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE])