Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0297536

EP0297536 - N-(polyoxyalkyl)-N-(alkyl)amines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.06.1998
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUNTSMAN PETROCHEMICAL CORPORATION
500 Huntsman Way
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
[1996/35]
Former [1989/01]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gerkin, Richard Michael
5300 Kensington Drive
Cross Lanes West Virginia 25313 / US
02 / Schreck, David James
5226 Sun Valley Drive
Cross Lanes West Virginia 25313 / US
03 / Smith, Danny Elwood
142 Cradle Drive
Cross Lanes West Virginia 25313 / US
[1989/01]
Representative(s)Wuesthoff, Franz , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/01]Wuesthoff, Franz, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date88110369.129.06.1988
[1989/01]
Priority number, dateUS1987006782230.06.1987         Original published format: US 67822
US1988017621731.03.1988         Original published format: US 176217
[1989/04]
Former [1989/01]US1987006782230.06.1987
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0297536
Date:04.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0297536
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0297536
Date:13.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1990
ClassificationInternational:C08G65/32, C08G18/50
[1989/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/01]
TitleGerman:N-(Polyoxyalkyl)-N-(alkyl)amine[1989/01]
English:N-(polyoxyalkyl)-N-(alkyl)amines[1989/01]
French:N-(Polyoxyalkylène)-N-(alkylène)amines[1989/01]
Examination procedure05.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/35]
29.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.07.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.01.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.1997Fee for grant paid
27.03.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination13.07.1992Appeal received No.  T0884/92
11.09.1992Statement of grounds filed
10.10.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/41]
22.11.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/47]
22.04.1996Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)14.05.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
18.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
10.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
07.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.07.199508   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1995
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
CH13.08.1997
ES13.08.1997
GR13.08.1997
IT13.08.1997
LI13.08.1997
NL13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
[2007/52]
Former [2003/07]AT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
CH13.08.1997
ES13.08.1997
GR13.08.1997
IT13.08.1997
LI13.08.1997
NL13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Former [2002/24]AT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
CH13.08.1997
ES13.08.1997
GR13.08.1997
IT13.08.1997
LI13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Former [2000/04]AT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
CH13.08.1997
GR13.08.1997
IT13.08.1997
LI13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Former [1999/42]AT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
CH13.08.1997
IT13.08.1997
LI13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Former [1998/43]AT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
CH13.08.1997
LI13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Former [1998/21]AT13.08.1997
BE13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Former [1998/15]AT13.08.1997
SE13.11.1997
Documents cited:Search[XD]US4417075  (STOGRYN EUGENE L [US]);
 [XPD]US4686242  (TURNER ROBERT B [US], et al);
 [XD]FR1466708  (HOECHST AG);
 [XD]US4286074  (DAVIS JOHN E, et al);
 [X]US4448904  (DOMINGUEZ RICHARD J G [US]);
 [X]FR1358187  (GEN TIRE & RUBBER CO)
ExaminationUS4152353
    - WO-A1-86/05795