Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0298459

EP0298459 - A belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.06.1990
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome
Kariya City, Aichi Pref. / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/02]For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome
Kariya City Aichi Pref. / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kobayashi, Toshimitsu
43 Kuchizengo Nawa-cho
Tokai City Aichi pref. / JP
02 / Inagaki, Akio
14 Toriyama, Shimasaka-cho
Okazaki City Aichi pref. / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Yasuhiro
1-182, Nanyo
Chiryu City Aichi pref. / JP
04 / Mori, Masanori
2-337 Simonagare Ushida-cho
Chiryu City Aichi pref. / JP
05 / Sakakibara, Takashi
2-1 Horisaki-cho
Handa City Aichi pref. / JP
[1989/02]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Tiedtke, Harro , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Former [1989/02]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date88110799.906.07.1988
[1989/02]
Priority number, dateJP1987017340710.07.1987         Original published format: JP 17340787
JP1987017340810.07.1987         Original published format: JP 17340887
[1989/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0298459
Date:11.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0298459
Date:31.05.1989
Language:EN
[1989/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.1989
ClassificationInternational:F16G1/08, F16G1/16
[1989/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1989/02]
TitleGerman:Riemen[1989/02]
English:A belt[1989/02]
French:Courroie[1989/02]
File destroyed:28.01.1999
Examination procedure01.12.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/30]
28.02.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1990/30]
Documents cited:SearchUS4215590  [ ] (BAHIMAN HOSSEIN [US]);
 US42155090  [ ];
 US4198875  [ ] (SCHNEIDER DANIEL J [US]);
 DE839583  [ ] (DUNLOP RUBBER CO);
 DE834484  [ ] (LYNENWERK KG);
 JP6146275Y  [ ];
 EP0119037  [ ] (UNIROYAL INC [US]);
 EP0069589  [ ] (MILLIKEN IND LTD [GB]);
 [X]JPS60157546
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 322 (M-440)[2045]18th December 1985; & JP-A-60 157 546 (SATAKE SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 17-08-1985