blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0297627

EP0297627 - Method of identifying objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.1993
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.1993 [1993/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO
3-6, Akasaka 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Yuji
5-2-304, Ueno 2-chome
Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP
02 / Kondo, Toshiaki
4-4, Ueno 2-chome
Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu / JP
[1989/01]
Representative(s)von Kirschbaum, Albrecht
Patentanwalt
Postfach 1520
82102 Germering / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/01]von Kirschbaum, Albrecht, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Postfach 15 20
D-82102 Germering / DE
Application number, filing date88111211.409.04.1984
[1989/01]
Priority number, dateJP1983006337011.04.1983         Original published format: JP 6337083
JP1983007446427.04.1983         Original published format: JP 7446483
[1989/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0297627
Date:04.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0297627
Date:12.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0297627
Date:18.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:G06K9/62
[1989/01]
CPC:
G06V10/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1989/01]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Identifizieren von Objekten[1989/01]
English:Method of identifying objects[1989/01]
French:Méthode pour identifier des objets[1989/01]
Examination procedure13.07.1988Examination requested  [1989/01]
21.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.1991Fee for grant paid
09.11.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP84103973.8  / EP0124789
Opposition(s)19.12.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
27.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
26.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 07
15.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3947833  (ECKSTEIN JR ROYAL W);
 [A]US4017721  (MICHAUD JIMMIE A);
 [A]EP0047127  (FUJITSU LTD [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.