Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0301360

EP0301360 - Shock wave apparatus with a central ultrasonic location system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.1994
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.1994Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.12.1994 [1994/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Former [1989/05]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-8000 München 2 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grasser, Franz
Neuwiesenstrasse 27
D-8551 Eggolsheim / DE
02 / Reichenberger, Helmut, Dr.
Begonienstrasse 28
D-8501 Eckental / DE
03 / Naser, Georg
Karlstrasse 10
D-8502 Zirndorf / DE
04 / Hassler, Dietrich
Flurweg 3
D-8525 Uttenreuth / DE
05 / Schmidt, Erhard
Heuwaagstrasse 20a
D-8520 Erlangen / DE
[1993/46]
Former [1989/05]01 / Grasser, Franz
Neuwiesenstrasse 27
D-8551 Eggolsheim / DE
02 / Reichenberger, Helmut, Dr.
Begonienstrasse 28
D-8501 Eckental / DE
03 / Naser, Georg
Karlstrasse 10
D-8502 Zirndorf / DE
04 / Hassler, Dietrich
Flurweg 3
D-8525 Uttenreuth / DE
05 / Schmith, Erhard
Heuwaagstrasse 20a
D-8520 Erlangen / DE
Application number, filing date88111545.518.07.1988
[1989/05]
Priority number, dateDE1987372553331.07.1987         Original published format: DE 3725533
DE1987372769119.08.1987         Original published format: DE 3727691
[1989/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0301360
Date:01.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0301360
Date:18.11.1993
Language:DE
[1993/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.1988
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/22, G10K9/12
[1993/46]
Former International [1989/05]A61B17/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1989/05]
TitleGerman:Stosswellenquelle mit zentralem Ultraschall-Ortungssystem[1989/05]
English:Shock wave apparatus with a central ultrasonic location system[1989/05]
French:Générateur d'ondes de choc avec système central de repèrage ultrasonique[1989/05]
Examination procedure21.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/17]
23.07.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.05.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.08.1993Fee for grant paid
04.08.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.08.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.11.1993
[1994/49]
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE3328039  ;
 [A]FR2591467
ExaminationEP0268082