blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0303284

EP0303284 - Immunological method for the determination of free haptenic substances [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.03.2000
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B.R.A.H.M.S Diagnostica GmbH
Komturstrasse 19-20
D-12099 Berlin / DE
[1995/26]
Former [1994/31]For all designated states
Henning Berlin Anlagen GmbH
Komturstrasse 58-62
D-12099 Berlin / DE
Former [1992/03]For all designated states
Henning Berlin GmbH Chemie- und Pharmawerk
Komturstrasse 58-62
D-12099 Berlin / DE
Former [1989/07]For all designated states
HENNING BERLIN GMBH
Komturstrasse 58-62
D-12099 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gadow, André, Dr.
Fliederweg 3
D-6380 Bad Homburg 6 / DE
02 / Hantke, Uwe
Marlenestr. 39
D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE
03 / Thoma, Rudy
Hausstockweg 14a
D-1000 Berlin 42 / DE
04 / Rokos, Hartmut, Dr.
Am Fischtal 24b
D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE
[1992/25]
Former [1989/07]01 / Gadow, André, Dr.
Fliederweg 3
D-6380 Bad Homburg 6 / DE
02 / Hantke, Uwe
Marlenestrasse 39
D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE
03 / Thoma, Rudy
Hausstockweg 14a
D-1000 Berlin 42 / DE
04 / Rokos, Hartmut, Dr.
Am Fischtal 24b
D-1000 Berlin 37 / DE
Representative(s)Andrae, Steffen, et al
Andrae l Westendorp
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Andrae, Steffen, et al
Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55
81541 München / DE
Former [1989/07]Andrae, Steffen, Dr., et al
Patentanwälte Andrae, Flach, Haug, Kneissl Balanstrasse 55
D-81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date88113141.112.08.1988
[1989/07]
Priority number, dateDE1987372723814.08.1987         Original published format: DE 3727238
[1989/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0303284
Date:15.02.1989
Language:DE
[1989/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0303284
Date:17.06.1992
Language:DE
[1992/25]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0303284
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.1988
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/543, G01N33/78, // G01N33/531
[1989/07]
CPC:
G01N33/78 (EP,US); G01N33/54306 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/07]
TitleGerman:Immunologisches Bestimmungsverfahren zur Bestimmung von Hapteneigenschaften aufweisenden freien Substanzen[1989/07]
English:Immunological method for the determination of free haptenic substances[1989/07]
French:Procédé immunologique pour déterminer des substances hapténiques libres[1989/07]
Examination procedure01.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/18]
19.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.09.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
11.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.1991Fee for grant paid
24.12.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.03.1993  30.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH
Postfach 10 03 10
D-78403 Konstanz / DE
Opponent's representative
Lehn, Werner
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 02  16.03.1993  30.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
University College London EKINS, Roger Philip
Gower Street, Ponweed Place Friday Street, Abinger Common near Dorking London WC1E 6BT
Surrey RH5 6JR / GB
Opponent's representative
Armitage, Ian Michael
Mewburn Ellis LLP
York House
23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
 [N/P]
Former [1996/01]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.1993  30.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH
Postfach 10 03 10
D-78403 Konstanz / DE
Opponent's representative
Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing.
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
D-81925 München / DE
 02  16.03.1993  30.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
University College London / EKINS, Roger Philip
Gower Street / Ponweed Place, Friday Street, Abinger Common, near Dorking
London WC1E 6BT / Surrey RH5 6JR / GB
Opponent's representative
Armitage, Ian Michael
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1995/36]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.1993  30.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH
Postfach 10 03 10
D-78403 Konstanz / DE
 02  16.03.1993  30.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
University College London / EKINS, Roger Philip
Gower Street / Ponweed Place, Friday Street, Abinger Common, near Dorking
London WC1E 6BT / Surrey RH5 6JR / GB
Opponent's representative
Armitage, Ian Michael
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1993/19]
Opponent(s)01  16.03.1993   
Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH
Postfach 10 03 10
D-78403 Konstanz / DE
 02  16.03.1993   
University College London / EKINS, Roger Philip
Gower Street / Ponweed Place, Friday Street, Abinger Common, near Dorking
London WC1E 6BT / Surrey RH5 6JR / GB
Opponent's representative
Hale, Stephen Geoffrey
J.Y. & G.W. Johnson Furnival House 14/18 High Holborn
London WC1V 6DE / GB
08.07.1993Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.01.1994Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
05.12.1994Reply to a communication from the opposition division
12.12.1995Date of oral proceedings
05.02.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.02.1996Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.01.2000Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.02.2000Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.02.2000Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition13.03.1996Appeal received No.  T0241/96
13.06.1996Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2000Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU12.08.1996
ES13.08.1996
SE13.08.1996
GR28.02.1997
NL01.03.1997
GB12.08.1997
[2004/38]
Former [2004/37]ES13.08.1996
SE13.08.1996
LU31.08.1996
GR28.02.1997
NL01.03.1997
GB12.08.1997
Former [2002/24]SE13.08.1996
LU31.08.1996
GR28.02.1997
NL01.03.1997
GB12.08.1997
ES01.12.1999
Former [2000/24]SE13.08.1996
LU31.08.1996
NL01.03.1997
GB12.08.1997
ES01.12.1999
Former [2000/06]SE13.08.1996
LU31.08.1996
NL01.03.1997
GB12.08.1997
Former [1998/30]SE13.08.1996
NL01.03.1997
GB12.08.1997
Former [1997/52]SE13.08.1996
NL01.03.1997
Former [1997/39]SE13.08.1996
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0089806  (AMERSHAM INT PLC [GB]);
 [X]WO8303306  (EKINS ROGER PHILIP);
 [X]US4434236  (FREYTAG J WILLIAM [US]);
 [X]EP0143274  (DU PONT [US]);
 [X]EP0182385  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]);
 [XP]EP0246152  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]);
 [XP]EP0254929  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.