Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0306810 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0306810



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 651
17.02.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.02.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.02.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.02.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.02.2000 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
18.01.2000 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
18.01.2000 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
18.01.2000 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
04.11.1999 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
04.11.1999 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
04.11.1999 Text intended for grant Opposition 4
28.10.1999 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
20.10.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.10.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.10.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.10.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.09.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.09.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.09.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.09.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
21.09.1999 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
08.09.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.08.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.08.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.08.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.08.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
31.08.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.08.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.08.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
20.08.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
07.12.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.12.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.12.1998 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.12.1998 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.12.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
01.12.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
01.12.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
01.12.1998 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
01.12.1998 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 8
20.11.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
16.11.1998 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.07.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.07.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.07.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.07.1998 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
14.07.1998 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.11.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.11.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
28.11.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.11.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
06.10.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.10.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.10.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
06.10.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.10.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.10.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.10.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
22.09.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
22.09.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
22.09.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.09.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
22.09.1997 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.09.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 38
18.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.07.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.07.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.07.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
18.07.1997 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
10.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
08.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.1997 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
12.03.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.03.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.03.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.02.1997 Claims Appeal 2
28.02.1997 Description Appeal 3
28.02.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
27.02.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 22
23.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1996 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.12.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.12.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.12.1996 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.12.1996 Authorisation Appeal 1
21.12.1996 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
20.12.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
20.12.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
20.12.1996 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
14.12.1996 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.11.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.11.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.11.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.10.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.10.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
29.10.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.10.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.10.1996 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
24.10.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
24.10.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
24.10.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
24.10.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
24.10.1996 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
24.10.1996 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
24.10.1996 Means of redress Opposition 1
24.10.1996 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
14.10.1996 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
02.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.08.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.08.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.08.1996 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
02.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.08.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.07.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
24.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
07.06.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.06.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.06.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
01.06.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.06.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
01.06.1996 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.05.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.05.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
30.05.1996 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
30.05.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.05.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.05.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
30.05.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
17.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
13.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
08.05.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.05.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
03.05.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
30.04.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
04.04.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.03.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 8
28.12.1995 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
28.12.1995 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
12.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.10.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
30.09.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
21.08.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
10.08.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
10.08.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor Search / examination 1
28.07.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.07.1995 Annex Search / examination 10
21.07.1995 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 3
11.07.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.07.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.07.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
31.03.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
27.03.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.03.1995 N/A Opposition 1
27.03.1995 N/A Opposition 1
27.03.1995 N/A Opposition 1
24.03.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.03.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.03.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.03.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.03.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
15.03.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.03.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.01.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.01.1995 Request for documents Opposition 1
02.01.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.01.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
23.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
22.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
22.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
09.12.1994 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
01.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
01.12.1994 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.12.1994 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.08.1994 Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
10.02.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.11.1993 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.11.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
24.11.1993 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
22.09.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
15.09.1993 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.09.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
06.09.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
09.08.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
18.06.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
15.02.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.11.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
05.11.1992 Description Search / examination 3
05.11.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.07.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.05.1992 Claims Search / examination 2
23.05.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.01.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
16.08.1991 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
16.08.1991 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
30.07.1991 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
30.07.1991 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 3
30.07.1991 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 6
30.07.1991 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 2
30.07.1991 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
11.04.1990 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.04.1990 European search report Search / examination 2
26.04.1989 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
08.04.1989 Annex Search / examination 6
08.04.1989 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 2
01.02.1989 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.08.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.08.1988 Claims Search / examination 2
31.08.1988 Description Search / examination 4
31.08.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.08.1988 Priority document Search / examination 8
31.08.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5