blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0306904

EP0306904 - Phosphoric acid diesters and salts thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.07.1994 [1994/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Hiranomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]For all designated states
Senju Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Hiranomachi 3-chome Higashi-ku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshida, Koichi
1652-1, Sakazu
Kurashiki-shi Okayama / JP
02 / Takigawa, Tetsuo
160-4, Bakuro-cho
Kurashiki-shi Okayama / JP
03 / Ogata, Kazumi
B-701, 8, Kamishinden 4-chome
Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP
04 / Yoshida, Kenichi
2, Kitahonmachi 2-chome
Itami-shi Hyogo / JP
[1989/11]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
D-50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date88114555.107.09.1988
[1989/11]
Priority number, dateJP1987022884511.09.1987         Original published format: JP 22884587
[1989/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0306904
Date:15.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0306904
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0306904
Date:28.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:C07F9/12, C09K15/32
[1989/11]
CPC:
C07F9/65586 (EP); A23L3/3544 (EP); A23L3/3553 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP); C09K15/322 (EP); Y02P20/55 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/11]
TitleGerman:Phosphorsäurediester und Salze davon[1989/11]
English:Phosphoric acid diesters and salts thereof[1989/11]
French:Diesters d'acide phosphorique et leurs sels[1989/11]
Examination procedure14.09.1990Examination requested  [1990/45]
04.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.01.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.03.1993Fee for grant paid
27.03.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
28.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]JP63139972  ;
 [Y]US3749680  (HINKLEY D);
 [YD]EP0127471  (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP])
 [XP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 6, 7th August 1989, page 387, abstract no. 45280t, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-63 139 972 (SHISEIDO CO., LTD; SENJU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD) 11-06-1988, & JP63139972 A 00000000
Examination   - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 6, 07 August 1989, Columbus, OH (US); p. 387, no. 45280t#
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.