blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0315748

EP0315748 - Positive-working radiation-sensitive composistion and radiation-sensitive recording material produced therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.1996 [1996/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/20]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dössel, Karl-Friedrich, Dr.
Fritz-Kalle-Strasse 8
D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
02 / Dammel, Ralph, Dr.
Eibenweg 39
D-6500 Mainz-Bretzenheim / DE
03 / Lingnau, Jürgen, Dr.
Karolingerstrasse 10
D-6500 Mainz-Laubenheim / DE
[1989/20]
Application number, filing date88114590.807.09.1988
[1989/20]
Priority number, dateDE1987373078713.09.1987         Original published format: DE 3730787
[1989/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0315748
Date:17.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0315748
Date:31.07.1991
Language:DE
[1991/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0315748
Date:20.12.1995
Language:DE
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.06.1991
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/004, C07C43/315, C07C43/32, C07C45/72, C07C49/84
[1995/51]
CPC:
G03F7/0045 (EP,US); G03C1/72 (KR); C07C43/315 (EP,US);
C07C43/32 (EP,US); C07C45/72 (EP,US); C07C49/84 (EP,US)
C-Set:
C07C45/72, C07C49/84 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1989/20]G03F7/10, G03C1/72, C07C43/307, C07C43/305, C07C43/303, C07C43/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1995/24]
Former [1989/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Positiv arbeitendes strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch und daraus hergestelltes strahlungsempfindliches Aufzeichungsmaterial[1989/20]
English:Positive-working radiation-sensitive composistion and radiation-sensitive recording material produced therefrom[1989/20]
French:Composistion sensible aux rayonnements à effet positif et matériel d'enregistrement sensible aux rayonnements produit de cette composition[1995/51]
Former [1989/20]Composistion sensible aux rayonnements à effet positif et matérield'enregistrement sensible aux rayonnements produit de cette composition
Examination procedure19.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/08]
16.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.1995Fee for grant paid
07.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
02.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0006627  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [AD]FR2389155  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [AD]FR2305757  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [AD]EP0202196  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.