Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0312925

EP0312925 - Method for uniting printed sheets to form blocks particularly for realising calendars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.1990
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 22.08.2007  [2007/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CALENDRIERS JEAN LAVIGNE
31, Rue des Princes
F-92150 Boulogne sur Seine / FR
[1989/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Augros, Jean
1, Rue du Lavoir
F-78140 Velizy / FR
[1989/17]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1990/02]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
D-80469 München / DE
Former [1989/17]Casalonga, Axel
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
D-8000 Munich 5 / DE
Application number, filing date88117092.214.10.1988
[1989/17]
Priority number, dateFR1987001455721.10.1987         Original published format: FR 8714557
[1989/17]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0312925
Date:26.04.1989
Language:FR
[1989/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0312925
Date:01.08.1990
Language:FR
[1990/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.02.1989
ClassificationInternational:B42C9/00
[1989/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zusammenfalten von bedruckten Bögen in Stapeln, insbesondere zum Bilden von Kalendern[1989/17]
English:Method for uniting printed sheets to form blocks particularly for realising calendars[1989/17]
French:Procédé de réunion en blocs de feuillets imprimés, notamment pour constituer des calendriers[1989/17]
Examination procedure03.04.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
29.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/30]
29.09.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.09.1989Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.1990Fee for grant paid
24.04.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.04.1991  11.02.1993  INADMISSIBLE
Tecnoblock S.r.l.
Via del Mella 11/H
Brescia / IT
Opponent's representative
Manzoni, Alessandro, et al
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
25121 Brescia / IT
 [N/P]
Former [1995/19]
Opponent(s)01  27.04.1991  11.02.1993  INADMISSIBLE
Tecnoblock S.r.l.
Via del Mella 11/H
Brescia / IT
Opponent's representative
Manzoni, Alessandro, et al
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
I-25121 Brescia / IT
Former [1991/26]
Opponent(s)01  27.04.1991   
Tecnoblock S.r.l.
Via del Mella 11/H
Brescia / IT
Opponent's representative
Manzoni, Alessandro, et al
MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2
I-25121 Brescia / IT
15.05.1991No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
24.05.1991No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
28.11.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.06.1992Date of oral proceedings
14.07.1992Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.09.1992Appeal received No.  T0873/92
15.09.1992Statement of grounds filed
22.01.1993Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
LU14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
GR31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
ES15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
FR28.06.2002
IT14.10.2005
[2007/34]
Former [2004/38]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
LU14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
GR31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
ES15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
FR28.06.2002
Former [2004/28]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
GR31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
ES15.10.2001
BE31.10.2001
FR28.06.2002
Former [2004/14]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
GR31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
BE31.10.2001
FR28.06.2002
ES13.11.2002
Former [2004/09]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
GR31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
BE31.10.2001
FR28.06.2002
Former [2003/32]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
BE31.10.2001
GR09.02.2002
FR28.06.2002
Former [2003/19]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
BE31.10.2001
GR09.02.2002
Former [2003/06]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
BE31.10.2001
Former [2000/06]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
LU31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
Former [1998/50]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
CH31.10.1997
LI31.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
Former [1998/43]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
SE15.10.1997
NL01.05.1998
Former [1998/41]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
GB14.10.1997
Former [1998/40]DE19.03.1997
AT14.10.1997
Former [1997/29]DE19.03.1997
Documents cited:Search[X]BE877410  (KERCHOVE D EXAERDE JOSSE G DE);
 [Y]EP0015153  (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US])