Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0312925 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0312925



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 172
02.02.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
02.02.1993 Termination of the opposition proceedings for one opponent (further opponents present) Opposition 1
01.02.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
01.02.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.01.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 8
11.12.1992 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
04.12.1992 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
04.12.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
22.10.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
22.10.1992 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
22.10.1992 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.10.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
15.09.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.07.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
16.07.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
14.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
14.07.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.07.1992 Decision concerning the inadmissibility of the opposition to opponent Opposition 2
14.07.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
14.07.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
14.07.1992 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
23.04.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.04.1992 Claims Opposition 1
14.04.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 21
02.03.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
14.01.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.01.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.01.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.12.1991 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
23.12.1991 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.12.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.12.1991 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
19.12.1991 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.1991 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.12.1991 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.12.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.1991 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
28.11.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.11.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.11.1991 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.05.1991 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.05.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.05.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.05.1991 Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied Opposition 1
10.05.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.05.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.05.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.04.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.04.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 1
22.06.1990 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.04.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.04.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
24.04.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
05.02.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
15.01.1990 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
29.09.1989 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
29.09.1989 Text intended for grant Search / examination 4
20.09.1989 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
04.09.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
04.09.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
04.09.1989 Description Search / examination 3
04.09.1989 Description Search / examination 3
04.09.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.08.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
03.04.1989 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
15.03.1989 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.02.1989 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
15.02.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.02.1989 European search report Search / examination 2
14.10.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.10.1988 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
14.10.1988 Claims Search / examination 1
14.10.1988 Description Search / examination 4
14.10.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.1988 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
14.10.1988 Priority document Search / examination 5
14.10.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5