Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0314093

EP0314093 - Disc interface circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.11.1990
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.1990Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.1991 [1991/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CORE INTERNATIONAL INC.
7171 North Federal Highway Boca Raton
Florida 33431 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/18]For all designated states
CORE INTERNATIONAL INC.
7171 North Federal Highway
Boca Raton Florida 33431 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Prewitt, Hal
771 N.E. 33rd Street
Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US
[1989/18]
Representative(s)Schickedanz, Willi
Langener Strasse 68
63073 Offenbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/18]Schickedanz, Willi, Dipl.-Ing.
Langener Strasse 68
D-63073 Offenbach / DE
Application number, filing date88117824.826.10.1988
[1989/18]
Priority number, dateUS1987011388027.10.1987         Original published format: US 113880
[1989/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0314093
Date:03.05.1989
Language:EN
[1989/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0314093
Date:23.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.1989
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06, G06F1/00
[1989/47]
Former International [1989/18]G06F3/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/18]
TitleGerman:Plattenschnittstellenschaltung[1989/18]
English:Disc interface circuit[1989/18]
French:Circuit d'interface pour disque[1989/18]
File destroyed:16.03.1999
Examination procedure24.05.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/02]
10.08.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1991/02]
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0104982  (THOMSON BRANDT [FR]);
 [A]US4641207  (GREEN GEORGE D [US], et al)
 [Y]  - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 28, no. 22, 25th October 1980, pages 111-115, Rochelle Park, New Jersey, US; J.V. JAWORSKI: "Controller for hard disks handles four drives at once"
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 30, no. 3, August 1987, pages 1253-1255, New York, US; "Personal computer structure designed for robotized manufacturability"