Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0365702

EP0365702 - Digital position generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.07.1994
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heimann Optoelectronics GmbH
Weher Köppel 6
D-65199 Wiesbaden / DE
[1992/49]
Former [1990/18]For all designated states
Heimann GmbH
Weher Köppel 6 Postfach 30 07
D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dennhoven, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kastanienweg 13
D-5421 Osterspai / DE
02 / Fichtner, Frank, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Schmittrain 12
D-6501 Uelversheim / DE
03 / Gauer, Mario, Dr. rer. nat. Dipl.Phys.
Moselstrasse 2b
D-6620 Völklingen / DE
04 / Holzenkämpfer, Enno, Dr. rer. nat. Dipl.-Phys.
Beethovenstrasse 2
D-6204 Taunusstein 4 / DE
05 / Traupe, Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Biebricher Allee 124
D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
[1990/18]
Representative(s)Beetz & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Robert-Koch-Str. 1
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/11]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1993/24]Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr
Steinsdorfstrasse 10
D-80538 München / DE
Former [1993/08](deleted)
...
Former [1990/18]Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Postfach 22 13 17
D-80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date88117857.826.10.1988
[1990/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0365702
Date:02.05.1990
Language:DE
[1990/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.1989
ClassificationInternational:G02F7/00, H01J29/45, H03M1/22
[1990/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1990/18]
TitleGerman:Digitaler Stellungsgeber[1990/18]
English:Digital position generator[1990/18]
French:Transmetteur de position numérique[1990/18]
Examination procedure26.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/38]
05.02.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.09.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/10]
25.09.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/34]
05.10.1992Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/10]
09.06.1994Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/34]
Appeal following examination05.04.1993Appeal received No.  T0469/93
05.04.1993Statement of grounds filed
03.09.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/36]
05.11.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/45]
09.06.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
09.06.1994Date of oral proceedings
14.06.1994Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Request for re-establishment of rights:05.04.1993Date of receipt
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
05.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.11.199205   M06   Fee paid on   05.04.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]JP57176026  ;
 US4556816  [ ];
 EP0092293  [ ];
 US3521271  [ ]
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 23 (P-171)[1168], 29. Januar 1983; & JP-A-57 176 026 (OLYMPUS KOGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 29-10-1982, & JP57176026 A 00000000