blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0316742

EP0316742 - Machine for finishing work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1995
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.1995 [1995/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robotronic Maschinenbau GmbH
Im Dornschlag 6
D-77933 Lahr / DE
[1994/15]
Former [1990/01]For all designated states
Rast, Siegfried
Wonnhalde 7
D-77948 Friesenheim / DE
For all designated states
Hau-Simex GmbH
Langstrasse 39-41
D-63075 Offenbach / DE
Former [1989/21]For all designated states
Rast, Siegfried
Wonnhalde 7
D-77948 Friesenheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rast, Siegfried
Wonnhalde 7
D-Friesenheim 1 / DE
[1990/02]
Former [1989/21]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Schmitt, Hans, et al
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/21]Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13
D-79102 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date88118643.109.11.1988
[1989/21]
Priority number, dateDE19870015326U19.11.1987         Original published format: DE 8715326 U
[1989/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0316742
Date:24.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0316742
Date:10.10.1990
Language:DE
[1990/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0316742
Date:13.04.1994
Language:DE
[1994/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1990
ClassificationIPC:B24B27/00
[1989/21]
CPC:
B23Q7/047 (EP); B23Q39/04 (EP); B23Q5/00 (EP);
B24B27/0076 (EP); B25J9/0093 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1989/21]
TitleGerman:Maschine zum Fertigbearbeiten von Werkstücken[1989/21]
English:Machine for finishing work pieces[1989/21]
French:Machine pour la finition de pièces[1989/21]
Examination procedure01.10.1990Examination requested  [1990/48]
06.05.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.1992Fee for grant paid
16.11.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
03.09.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0035267  (TEKHNECON SERVICES LTD [GB]);
 [Y]DE1811462  (RHEINSTAHL HENSCHEL AG);
 [A]GB751657  (CAMPAGNOLO TULLIO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.