Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0320989 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0320989



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 782
27.12.2000 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
22.12.2000 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
04.12.2000 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
04.12.2000 Translation of the claims Opposition 11
04.12.2000 Translation of the claims Opposition 9
01.12.2000 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 21
01.12.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
24.08.2000 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
24.08.2000 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
24.08.2000 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
23.08.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.08.2000 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
04.07.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.07.2000 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
19.01.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.2000 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.01.2000 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
11.01.2000 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
05.01.2000 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
05.01.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.12.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
15.12.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.12.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
14.12.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.12.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
09.12.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
08.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
04.12.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.12.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
22.11.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
22.11.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
19.11.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.11.1999 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
16.11.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
05.11.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 2
29.07.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
19.07.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 22
09.07.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
06.07.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.07.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
14.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.05.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
07.05.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
06.05.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
16.03.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
16.03.1999 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
08.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
05.03.1999 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
16.02.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
18.01.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.12.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.11.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.11.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.10.1998 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.06.1998 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.06.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
03.06.1998 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 7
07.05.1998 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.05.1998 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.04.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
06.04.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.04.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
06.04.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
06.04.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 68
06.04.1998 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 36
03.04.1998 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.02.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.02.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.02.1998 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
05.02.1998 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
05.02.1998 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 8
05.02.1998 Means of redress Opposition 1
01.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.12.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
25.11.1997 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
25.11.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
03.11.1997 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Opposition 1
03.11.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.11.1997 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Opposition 1
30.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.10.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.10.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.10.1997 Observations by third parties Opposition 2
27.10.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
24.10.1997 Observations by third parties Opposition 3
23.10.1997 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
13.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.10.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
08.10.1997 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
23.09.1997 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
23.09.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.07.1997 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
15.07.1997 Invitation to file an authorisation Opposition 1
10.07.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.07.1997 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.07.1997 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
01.07.1997 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
17.04.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.04.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.04.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.04.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.04.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.04.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
04.04.1997 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 4
04.04.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.04.1997 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.03.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.03.1997 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.03.1997 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
18.04.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.04.1996 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
15.01.1996 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
15.01.1996 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
23.11.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.11.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
13.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.09.1995 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 13
29.06.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.06.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.03.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
03.03.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.02.1995 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.02.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.02.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
31.01.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.01.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
23.01.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
17.03.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.01.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.01.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 9
17.01.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 10
29.10.1993 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
14.10.1993 Description Search / examination 1
14.10.1993 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.08.1993 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
10.08.1993 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
14.04.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.04.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 53
22.03.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
25.02.1993 Claims Search / examination 3
25.02.1993 Description Search / examination 16
25.02.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.12.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.12.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.06.1992 Claims Search / examination 3
16.06.1992 Description Search / examination 2
16.06.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
02.03.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
14.08.1990 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
22.12.1989 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.12.1989 European search report Search / examination 3
12.04.1989 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
12.04.1989 Priority document Search / examination 50
12.04.1989 Priority document Search / examination 49
16.12.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.12.1988 Claims Search / examination 10
16.12.1988 Description Search / examination 28
16.12.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.12.1988 Drawings Search / examination 10
16.12.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6