Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0293983

EP0293983 - Method for analysing metal particles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.06.1996
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SORTEC GmbH
Hanauer Landstrasse 421
D-60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[1995/29]
Former [1988/49]For all designated states
METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG
Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14
D-60015 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Pötzschke, Manfred, Dr.
Ulmenweg 45
D-6242 Kronberg 2 / DE
02 / Sattler, Hans-Peter, Dr.
Ferdinandstrasse 22
D-6380 Bad Homburg / DE
03 / Hohla, Kristian, Dr.
Adolf-Sandberger Strasse 1 a
D-8000 München 60 / DE
04 / Loree, Thomas R., Dr.
4053 Sycamore
Los Alamos New Mexico 87 544 / US
[1988/49]
Application number, filing date88201073.930.05.1988
[1988/49]
Priority number, dateDE1987371867204.06.1987         Original published format: DE 3718672
[1988/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0293983
Date:07.12.1988
Language:DE
[1988/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0293983
Date:15.05.1991
Language:DE
[1991/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.1988
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/71, G01J3/28, B07C5/342
[1988/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/49]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Analyse von Metallteilchen[1988/49]
English:Method for analysing metal particles[1988/49]
French:Procédé pour analyser des particules métalliques[1988/49]
Examination procedure15.02.1989Examination requested  [1989/15]
18.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.08.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.1990Fee for grant paid
21.11.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.02.1992  19.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr.235
28309 Bremen / DE
 02  14.02.1992  18.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/11]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.1992  19.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
STN ATLAS Elektronik GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstr.235
28305 Bremen / DE
 02  14.02.1992  18.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
D-80636 München / DE
Former [1992/17]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.1992   
Atlas Elektronik GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
D-28305 Bremen / DE
 02  14.02.1992   
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
D-80636 München / DE
Former [1992/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.02.1992   
Atlas Elektronik GmbH
Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235
D-28305 Bremen / DE
23.03.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.11.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
13.11.1992Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
12.03.1993Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
02.07.1993Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
07.05.1996Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/33]
Appeal following opposition01.09.1993Appeal received No.  T0828/93
04.11.1993Statement of grounds filed
07.05.1996Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
07.05.1996Date of oral proceedings
13.05.1996Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2000/52]CH15.05.1991
LI15.05.1991
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2067753  (DEBEX PTY LTD);
 [A]EP0184590  (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP])
    [ ] - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, Band 41, Nr. 4, Mai/Juni 1987, Seiten 572-579, Society for Applied Spectroscopy, Baltimore, US; D.A. CREMERS: "The analysis of metals at a distance using laser-induced breakdown spetroscopy"
    [ ] - ELECTRO-OPTICAL SYSTEMS DESIGN, Band 14, Nr. 10, Oktober 1982, Seiten 35-41; T.R. LOREE et al.: "AES by LIBS may help you"
    [ ] - NAVY TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 10, Nr. 1, September 1984, Seiten 97-101; C. BELL et al.: "A method of remote optical spectrographic analysis of test materials"
    [ ] - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, Band 40, Nr. 4, Mai/Juni 1986, Seiten 491-494, Society for Applied Spectroscopy; J. MILLARD et al.: "Time-resolved laser-induced breakdown spectrometry for the rapid determination of beryllium in beryllium-copper alloys"