Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0293983 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0293983



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 398
25.06.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.06.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
25.06.1996 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
24.06.1996 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
13.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
13.05.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.05.1996 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
07.05.1996 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
06.05.1996 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
06.05.1996 F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation Appeal 1
06.05.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
10.04.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.04.1996 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
02.02.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.01.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.01.1996 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
26.01.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
26.01.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.01.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
26.01.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
11.01.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.01.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
11.01.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.01.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.12.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.11.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.11.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1995 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.06.1995 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
01.06.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.05.1995 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 2
23.05.1995 Request for assignment Appeal 1
23.12.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
20.12.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.12.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.05.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.05.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.05.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.03.1994 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.03.1994 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
23.03.1994 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.03.1994 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.01.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.01.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
15.11.1993 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
04.11.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
11.10.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.10.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.10.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
01.10.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.09.1993 Processing of an appeal Opposition 1
01.09.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
10.07.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.07.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.07.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.07.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.07.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.07.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.07.1993 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
02.07.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.07.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.07.1993 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
02.07.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
02.07.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
21.05.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
31.03.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.03.1993 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
12.03.1993 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
11.02.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.1993 General authorisation Opposition 1
29.01.1993 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 3
13.11.1992 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
13.11.1992 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
04.11.1992 Claims Opposition 1
04.11.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
02.11.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
12.10.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.10.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.10.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.10.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.08.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
01.08.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
31.07.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
28.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.03.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
23.03.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.03.1992 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
13.03.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
13.03.1992 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.03.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.02.1992 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.02.1992 Request for documents Opposition 1
17.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.02.1992 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
14.02.1992 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
14.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
14.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
14.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
14.02.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
11.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.02.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
11.02.1992 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
30.04.1991 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.04.1991 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.01.1991 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.01.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.01.1991 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.10.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
23.10.1990 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.09.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.09.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.09.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
10.08.1990 Claims Search / examination 3
10.08.1990 Description Search / examination 8
10.08.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
07.06.1990 Claims Search / examination 1
07.06.1990 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.05.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
13.12.1988 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.10.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.10.1988 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
17.10.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.10.1988 European search report Search / examination 2
17.10.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
17.10.1988 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
30.05.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 Claims Search / examination 5
30.05.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 Description Search / examination 8
30.05.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 Drawings Search / examination 2
30.05.1988 European search report Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 European search report Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.05.1988 Priority document Search / examination 14
30.05.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5