Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0295736 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0295736



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 848
19.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
04.07.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
04.07.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
04.07.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
01.07.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
10.06.2003 Translation of the claims Opposition 1
17.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.03.2003 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
11.03.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
11.03.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
11.03.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
11.03.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
01.03.2003 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
01.03.2003 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Opposition 1
26.02.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 29
09.01.2003 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
20.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.12.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 28
16.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
16.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
14.12.2002 Annex Appeal 9
14.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
11.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
11.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
11.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
11.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
11.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
11.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
11.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
10.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
10.12.2002 F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) Appeal 1
10.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
09.12.2002 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 9
09.12.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.12.2002 General authorisation Appeal 1
03.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.12.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.11.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
25.11.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
25.11.2002 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
25.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
25.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
21.11.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
21.11.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
21.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
18.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
18.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 11
18.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.11.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
18.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 10
18.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.11.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 2
06.11.2002 General authorisation Appeal 2
06.11.2002 Request for transfer of rights Appeal 2
06.11.2002 Submission concerning representation Appeal 1
16.10.2002 Request for change of representative Appeal 1
19.09.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.06.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
12.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
12.06.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.06.2002 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
07.06.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
07.06.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
06.06.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
07.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.09.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.09.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.07.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.07.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.07.2001 Request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.06.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.06.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.06.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
20.03.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.03.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
20.03.2001 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
19.03.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
14.03.2001 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
19.02.2001 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
19.02.2001 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.01.2001 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2001 Request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
06.12.2000 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.12.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.11.2000 Annex Appeal 10
28.11.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 28
28.11.2000 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
16.10.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
16.10.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.10.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.10.2000 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
05.10.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.09.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
21.09.2000 Document concerning appeal fee Appeal 1
20.09.2000 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
20.09.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.09.2000 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
13.09.2000 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.07.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
25.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.07.2000 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.07.2000 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
19.07.2000 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
19.07.2000 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
19.07.2000 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.07.2000 Text intended for grant Opposition 9
12.07.2000 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 10
12.07.2000 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
06.06.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.05.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
24.05.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
08.05.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.04.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
29.04.2000 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
29.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
29.04.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
29.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
27.04.2000 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.04.2000 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 11
26.04.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
19.04.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
15.01.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.01.2000 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.01.2000 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
27.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
21.12.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
16.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
16.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
09.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
09.12.1999 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
06.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
01.12.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
30.11.1999 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
26.11.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.11.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
26.11.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.11.1999 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.11.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.11.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.11.1999 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.10.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.10.1999 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
01.10.1999 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
01.10.1999 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
01.10.1999 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 3
01.10.1999 General authorisation Appeal 1
27.09.1999 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.09.1999 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.09.1999 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
21.09.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
21.09.1999 Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space Appeal 1
20.09.1999 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
20.09.1999 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
20.09.1999 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
16.09.1999 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
09.06.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
01.06.1999 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
28.05.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.05.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.05.1999 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
28.05.1999 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
26.05.1999 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.05.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.05.1999 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.05.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
11.05.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
11.05.1999 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
21.10.1998 Annex Search / examination 1
27.09.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.09.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
13.09.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.09.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.09.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.09.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.01.1998 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
19.12.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.1997 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.12.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
05.09.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
05.09.1997 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
29.08.1997 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
28.08.1997 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
04.07.1997 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.07.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
03.07.1997 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
18.06.1997 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
12.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
12.05.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.05.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.05.1997 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
30.04.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
30.04.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
30.04.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
30.04.1997 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
30.04.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.1997 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.04.1997 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
21.04.1997 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
12.03.1997 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
12.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.03.1997 General authorisation Opposition 1
12.03.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.03.1997 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 1
04.03.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
28.02.1997 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
15.10.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
20.09.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.09.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
11.09.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
04.09.1996 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
04.09.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.09.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
04.09.1996 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
23.08.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.08.1996 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 4
14.08.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
14.08.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.08.1996 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.1996 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.03.1996 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
28.02.1996 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 5
30.01.1996 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.01.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
28.12.1995 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.12.1995 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.11.1995 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
06.11.1995 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
26.10.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
22.06.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
22.06.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
22.06.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.06.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.06.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.05.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
23.05.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.05.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
18.05.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
18.05.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
18.05.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
18.05.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
18.05.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
18.05.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
18.05.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
17.05.1995 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.05.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
16.05.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
07.07.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
15.04.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.04.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
15.04.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
31.01.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
22.01.1994 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.12.1993 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
14.12.1993 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
25.11.1993 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
05.05.1993 Claims Search / examination 1
05.05.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.03.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.02.1993 Claims Search / examination 2
23.02.1993 Description Search / examination 4
23.02.1993 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.10.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
12.03.1992 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
22.08.1991 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.08.1991 European search report Search / examination 2
09.11.1988 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.07.1988 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.1988 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.1988 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
16.06.1988 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.06.1988 Priority document Search / examination 19
02.06.1988 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.06.1988 Claims Search / examination 4
02.06.1988 Description Search / examination 15
02.06.1988 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.1988 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.06.1988 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5