blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0311158

EP0311158 - Improved evaporator for coolant fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.1993
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.10.1993 [1993/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRAVO S.p.A.
Via Lago di Molveno, 4
I-36100 Vicenza / IT
[1989/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Bravo, Francesco
Via Parini, 1
I-36075 Montecchio Maggiore Vicenza / IT
[1989/15]
Representative(s)Martegani, Franco, et al
Franco Martegani S.r.l.
Via Carlo Alberto, 41
20052 Monza (Milano) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1989/15]Martegani, Franco, et al
Via Damiano Chiesa, 56
I-20099 Sesto San Giovanni (Milano) / IT
Application number, filing date88201895.505.09.1988
[1989/15]
Priority number, dateIT1987002203725.09.1987         Original published format: IT 2203787
[1989/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0311158
Date:12.04.1989
Language:EN
[1989/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0311158
Date:16.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0311158
Date:04.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.1990
ClassificationIPC:A23L3/36, A23G9/20, B01D1/22, F25B9/00
[1989/15]
CPC:
F28D7/026 (EP,US); A23B2/80 (EP,US); A23G9/222 (EP,US);
A23G9/225 (EP,US); B01D1/04 (EP,US); F25B39/02 (EP,US);
F28F9/22 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/15]
TitleGerman:Verdampfer für Kühlflüssigkeiten[1989/15]
English:Improved evaporator for coolant fluids[1989/15]
French:Evaporateur pour des liquides réfrigérants[1989/15]
Examination procedure19.09.1990Examination requested  [1990/46]
08.08.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.11.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.04.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.1992Fee for grant paid
01.07.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.08.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB720921  (MOTOR PRODUCTS CORP);
 [A]GB1332755  (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK);
 [A]DE2851125  (OESTBO KARL ROBERT AMBJOERN);
 [A]EP0152941  (FAST ICE SRL [IT])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.