Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0279652

EP0279652 - Method and apparatus for isolating and manipulating graphic objects on computer video monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.12.1990
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.1990Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.02.1991 [1991/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SENSOR FRAME INCORPORATED
Suite 3505 4516 Henry Street Pittsburgh
Pennsylvania 15213 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/34]For all designated states
SENSOR FRAME INCORPORATED
Suite 3505 4516 Henry Street
Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15213 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McAvinney, Paul
2349 Tilbury Avenue Pittsburgh
Pennsylvania 15217 / US
[1988/34]
Representative(s)Howden, Christopher A. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/34]Howden, Christopher Andrew , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
D-80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date88301332.817.02.1988
[1988/34]
Priority number, dateUS1987001494317.02.1987         Original published format: US 14943
[1988/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0279652
Date:24.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0279652
Date:27.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.1989
ClassificationInternational:G06K11/06, G06F3/033
[1990/02]
Former International [1988/34]G06K11/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1988/34]
TitleGerman:Methode und Gerät zur Isolierung und Handhabung graphischer Objekte auf einem Computervideo-Monitor[1988/34]
English:Method and apparatus for isolating and manipulating graphic objects on computer video monitor[1988/34]
French:Méthode et appareil pour isoler et manipuler des objets graphiques sur un moniteur vidéo d'un ordinateur[1988/34]
File destroyed:01.02.1999
Examination procedure28.06.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/06]
17.09.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1991/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.07.1990M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4144449  (FUNK BUDDY K, et al);
 [XD]US4247767  (O'BRIEN C DOUGLAS, et al);
 [A]EP0121840  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]US4305071  (BELL STEVE W, et al)