blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0282286

EP0282286 - Superconducting wire and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2013Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 05.06.2013  [2013/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[2013/23]
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
Former [1988/37]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Yutaka@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
02 / Murase, Satoru@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
03 / Yoshino, Hisashi@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
04 / Fukushima, Noburu@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
05 / Niu, Hiromi@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
06 / Nakayama, Shigeo@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
07 / Koizumi, Misao@c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
 [2013/23]
Former [1988/37]01 / Yamada, Yutaka c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
02 / Murase, Satoru c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
03 / Yoshino, Hisashi c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
04 / Fukushima, Noburu c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
05 / Niu, Hiromi c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
06 / Nakayama, Shigeo c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
07 / Koizumi, Misao c/o Patent Division
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
Representative(s)Granleese, Rhian Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/23]Granleese, Rhian Jane
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2007/43]Granleese, Rhian Jane
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2005/38]White, Duncan Rohan
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [1988/37]Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date88302050.509.03.1988
[1988/37]
Priority number, dateJP1987005685213.03.1987         Original published format: JP 5685287
JP1987005685613.03.1987         Original published format: JP 5685687
JP1987011431211.05.1987         Original published format: JP 11431287
JP1987011431511.05.1987         Original published format: JP 11431587
JP1987032172319.12.1987         Original published format: JP 32172387
JP1987032172419.12.1987         Original published format: JP 32172487
[1988/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0282286
Date:14.09.1988
Language:EN
[1988/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0282286
Date:06.12.1989
Language:EN
[1989/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0282286
Date:27.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/52]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0282286
Date:05.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.10.1989
ClassificationIPC:H01L39/24, H01B12/00
[1988/37]
CPC:
C04B35/45 (EP,US); C04B35/4504 (EP,US); H10N60/0801 (EP,US);
H10N60/203 (EP,US); Y10S428/93 (EP,US); Y10S505/704 (EP,US);
Y10S505/74 (EP,US); Y10T29/49014 (EP,US); Y10T428/2929 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1996/42]
Former [1988/37]CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Supraleitender Draht und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1988/37]
English:Superconducting wire and method of manufacturing the same[1988/37]
French:Fil supra-conducteur et méthode pour sa fabrication[1988/37]
MiscellaneousEPB 1996/52: (deleted)
EPB 1996/52: (deleted)
EPB 1996/52: (deleted)
EPB 1992/34: Teilanmeldung 92201690.2 eingereicht am 09/03/88
EPB 1992/34: Divisional application 92201690.2 filed on 09/03/88
EPB 1992/34: Demande divisionnaire 92201690.2 déposée le 09/03/88
Examination procedure25.03.1988Examination requested  [1988/37]
08.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.04.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.06.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.06.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.1996Fee for grant paid
20.09.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP92201690.2  / EP0505015
EP92201691.0  / EP0503746
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.09.1997  16.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
 02  26.09.1997  27.08.2002  WITHDRAWN
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD
1-3 Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku, Osaka 554 / JP
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/15]
Opponent(s)01  26.09.1997  16.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 02  26.09.1997  27.08.2002  WITHDRAWN
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD
1-3 Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku, Osaka 554 / JP
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät, et al, et al
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2002/51]
Opponent(s)01  26.09.1997  16.10.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
 02  26.09.1997  27.08.2002  WITHDRAWN
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD
1-3 Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku, Osaka 554 / JP
Opponent's representative
Meyer-Plath, Henning, Dr., et al, et al
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1997/47]
Opponent(s)01  26.09.1997   
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
D-80506 München / DE
 02  26.09.1997   
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES LTD
1-3 Shimaya 1-chome
Konohana-ku, Osaka 554 / JP
Opponent's representative
Meyer-Plath, Henning, et al, et al
Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
11.11.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.03.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2002Reply to a communication from the opposition division
17.10.2007Date of oral proceedings
16.11.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.03.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.01.2013Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.04.2013Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition18.08.2008Appeal received No.  T1870/08
10.11.2008Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2012Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
13.03.2012Date of oral proceedings
19.03.2012Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
09.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.03.2008
[2008/26]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0207315  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE], et al)
 [A]  - Zeitschrift fuer Physik B- Condensed Matter, Vol. 64, 1986, pages 189-193, Springer Verlag, DE, J.G. BEDNORZ et al.: "Possible high Tc superconductivity in the Ba-La-Cu-O system".
 [XP]  - Appl. Phys. Lett., Vol. 51, No. 3, July 20, 1987, pages 203-204, S. JIN et al.: "High Tc superconductors - composite wire fabrication".
 [XP]  - Physica B+C, Vol. 148B+C, Nos. 1-3, December 1987, pages 429-431, Amsterdam, NL, O. KOHNO et al.: "Characteristics of high-Tc oxide wire".
ExaminationEP0281444
OppositionUS3325888
 DE1257436
 US3471925
 US3623221
 DE2331962
 DE2351226
 US4003762
 EP0181496
 EP0073128
 JPH06225224
    - Japanese Journal of applied physics, (198704), vol. 26, pages 377 - 379, 4
    - IEEE transactions on magnetics, (198305), vol. 19, pages 402 - 405, 3
    - Science, (19870313), vol. 235, pages 1373 - 1376
    - Science, (19870130), vol. 235, pages 567 - 569
    - Nature/ International Weekly journal of science, (19870219), vol. 325, pages 664 - 665, 6106
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.