blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0294942

EP0294942 - Solid catalyst for polymerizing an olefin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/29]For all designated states
MITSUI CHEMICALS, INC.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1988/50]For all designated states
MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsutsui, Toshiyuki
3-6, Misono 1-chome
Ohtake-shi Hiroshima / JP
02 / Yoshitsugu, Ken
3-8, Misono 1-chome
Ohtake-shi Hiroshima / JP
03 / Toyota, Akinori
103-21, Minami-Iwakuni-machi 2-chome
Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi / JP
04 / Kashiwa, Norio
2-9, Muronoki-cho 1-chome
Iwakuni-chi Yamaguchi / JP
[1988/50]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/31]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [1988/50]Myerscough, Philip Boyd
J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date88304301.012.05.1988
[1988/50]
Priority number, dateJP1987011440913.05.1987         Original published format: JP 11440987
[1988/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0294942
Date:14.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0294942
Date:13.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/28]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0294942
Date:08.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.1988
ClassificationIPC:C08F4/60, C08F10/00
[1988/50]
CPC:
C08F10/00 (EP,US); C08F4/68 (KR); C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US); C08F4/65916 (EP,US); C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US); Y10S526/941 (EP,US); Y10S526/943 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08F10/00, C08F4/6428 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/65916 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/24, C08F2500/03 (US,EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1988/50]
TitleGerman:Fester Katalysator für Olefinpolymerisation[1988/50]
English:Solid catalyst for polymerizing an olefin[1988/50]
French:Catalyseur solide pour polymérisation d'une oléfine[1988/50]
Examination procedure30.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/22]
19.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.05.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.02.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.12.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.1994Fee for grant paid
22.02.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.04.1995  25.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polypropylen GmbH
Rheinstr. 4G
55116 Mainz / DE
Opponent's representative
Lederer, Franz, et al, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/42]
Opponent(s)01  13.04.1995  25.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polypropylen GmbH
Rheinstr. 4G
55116 Mainz / DE
Opponent's representative
Lederer, Franz, et al, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [2001/48]
Opponent(s)01  13.04.1995  25.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Basell Polypropylen GmbH
Rheinstr. 4G
55116 Mainz / DE
Opponent's representative
Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al, et al
Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [1998/18]
Opponent(s)01  13.04.1995  25.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
TARGOR GmbH
Rheinstr. 4 G
55116 Mainz / DE
Opponent's representative
Lederer, Franz, et al, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [1996/45]
Opponent(s)01  13.04.1995  25.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst AG
Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Geb. K801
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Lederer, Franz, et al, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16
80538 München / DE
Former [1995/23]
Opponent(s)01  13.04.1995  25.04.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Hoechst AG
Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Geb. K801
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
18.05.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.11.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M10)
22.11.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
06.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M09)
15.09.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
11.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
08.03.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.03.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.11.2001Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.12.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
28.02.2002Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition06.05.1999Appeal received No.  T0518/99
16.07.1999Statement of grounds filed
08.11.2001Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
08.11.2001Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:10.05.1991Request for further processing filed
13.05.1991Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.05.1991Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
11.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
09.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0120734  (ATOCHEM [FR]);
 [A]EP0129368
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.