Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0294101

EP0294101 - System for measuring the angular displacement of an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.1994
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EL-OP ELECTRO-OPTICS INDUSTRIES LIMITED
P.O. Box 1165
Rehovot 76 110 / IL
[1988/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Menn, Anatoly
58/8 Haviva Reich Street
Haifa / IL
02 / Krimerman, Joseph
20 Hatzalafim Street
Haifa / IL
[1988/49]
Representative(s)Miller, Joseph , et al
J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn
London WC1R 4JH / GB
[1988/49]
Application number, filing date88304776.326.05.1988
[1988/49]
Priority number, dateIL1931000082701.06.1987         Original published format: IL 82731
[1988/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0294101
Date:07.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0294101
Date:27.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0294101
Date:15.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.1990
ClassificationInternational:F41G3/22, G01S5/16
[1990/23]
Former International [1988/49]F41G3/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/49]
TitleGerman:Anordnung zum Messen einer Winkelverschiebung eines Gegenstandes[1988/49]
English:System for measuring the angular displacement of an object[1988/49]
French:Système de mesure du déplacement angulaire d'un objet[1988/49]
Examination procedure06.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/05]
10.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.06.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.1993Fee for grant paid
14.09.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
29.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
28.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
ES15.12.1993
FR15.12.1993
GR15.12.1993
IT15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
GB26.05.1994
[2006/14]
Former [2002/24]AT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
ES15.12.1993
GR15.12.1993
IT15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
FR06.05.1994
GB26.05.1994
Former [2000/04]AT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
GR15.12.1993
IT15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
FR06.05.1994
GB26.05.1994
Former [1999/42]AT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
IT15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
FR06.05.1994
GB26.05.1994
Former [1995/19]AT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
FR06.05.1994
GB26.05.1994
Former [1995/03]AT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
FR06.05.1994
Former [1994/48]AT15.12.1993
BE15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
Former [1994/46]AT15.12.1993
CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
Former [1994/43]CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
SE15.12.1993
Former [1994/39]CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
NL15.12.1993
Former [1994/31]CH15.12.1993
LI15.12.1993
Documents cited:Search[YP]US4672562  (EGLI WERNER H [US], et al);
 [YP]EP0260198  (THOMSON CSF [FR]);
 [A]US3917412  (STOUTMEYER RONALD G, et al);
 [AD]GB1520154  (ELLIOTT BROTHERS LONDON LTD);
 [A]EP0155858  (THOMSON CSF [FR]);
 [A]FR2433760  (THOMSON CSF)
 [A]  - PATENT JOURNAL OF SOUTH AFRICA, vol. 20th December 1987, no. 12 (30XII 1987) Pretoria, Southe Africa, page 120, ZA-87-68 (Leslie Middleton Bennett)