Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0294223

EP0294223 - Post-mix beverage dispenser valve with continuous solenoid modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.1993
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Coca-Cola Company
310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta
Georgia 30313 / US
[N/P]
Former [1988/49]For all designated states
THE COCA-COLA COMPANY
310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734
Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Whigham, Roger C.
657 Longwood Drive, N.W.
Atlanta Georgia 30305 / US
02 / The inventor has agreed to waive his entitlement to designation.
[1988/49]
Representative(s)Leale, Robin George , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1988/49]Leale, Robin George , et al
FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date88305091.603.06.1988
[1988/49]
Priority number, dateUS1987005844805.06.1987         Original published format: US 58448
[1988/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0294223
Date:07.12.1988
Language:EN
[1988/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0294223
Date:14.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0294223
Date:29.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1989
ClassificationInternational:B67D1/12
[1988/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/49]
TitleGerman:Ventil für einen Spender für nachträglich gemischte Getränke mit stetig modulierter Magnetspule[1988/49]
English:Post-mix beverage dispenser valve with continuous solenoid modulation[1988/49]
French:Soupape pour distributeur de boisson à mélange postérieur, ayant un solénoide modulé en continu[1988/49]
MiscellaneousEPB 1992/18: Teilanmeldung 91115446.6 eingereicht am 03/06/88
EPB 1992/18: Divisional application 91115446.6 filed on 03/06/88
EPB 1992/18: Demande divisionnaire 91115446.6 déposée le 03/06/88
Examination procedure24.11.1989Examination requested  [1990/04]
28.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.01.1992Fee for grant paid
03.01.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP91115446.6  / EP0467415
Opposition(s)30.01.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.04.1992
BE29.04.1992
CH29.04.1992
FR29.04.1992
GR29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
LU30.06.1992
[2006/14]
Former [2000/04]AT29.04.1992
BE29.04.1992
CH29.04.1992
GR29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
LU30.06.1992
FR18.09.1992
Former [1999/52]AT29.04.1992
BE29.04.1992
CH29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
LU30.06.1992
FR18.09.1992
Former [1993/11]AT29.04.1992
BE29.04.1992
CH29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
FR18.09.1992
Former [1993/03]AT29.04.1992
BE29.04.1992
CH29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
Former [1993/01]BE29.04.1992
CH29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
Former [1992/49]CH29.04.1992
LI29.04.1992
Documents cited:Search[YD]WO8302935  (SIGNET SCIENT CO [US]);
 [Y]US2587538  (HENRY SEAMAN);
 [Y]FR1484745  ;
 [A]DE2559323  (DUNGS KARL FA)