Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0295117

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 ES 
FR 
GB 
 GR 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure15.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
11.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 11
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 12
European patent granted05.04.2000
Opposition procedure06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 21.03.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:14.12.1988 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:09.08.1989 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19890614
 
Event date:15.05.1991 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19910328
 
Event date:20.07.1994 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:RHONE-POULENC AGRICULTURE LIMITED
 
Event date:22.03.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:05.04.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:191479
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000415
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:14.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE
 
Event date:19.04.2000 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.
 
Event date:11.05.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3856402
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000511
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:19.05.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:05.06.2000 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.
 
Event date:16.06.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2144390 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:22.09.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: FIPRONIL; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 92 00 308 19930721; FIRST REGISTRATION: FR - 92 00 308 19930721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:00C0026
Filing DATE:20000922
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:IT: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FOR HERBICIDAL PRODUCTS: NO ACTION TAKEN
Free Format Text:CCPF 74, 20001004; AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.
 
Event date:04.10.2000 
Event description:IT: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FOR PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS: NO ACTION TAKEN
Free Format Text:CCP 705, 20001004; AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.
 
Event date:30.10.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:0090022-5, 19951201
 
Event date:01.11.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:GBCTFFSPC/GB2000/026: 20001004
 
Event date:10.11.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR C1
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR CCP FOR PLANT PROTECTION LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC
Free Format Text:FRC1 2000C0026, 20000922
 
Event date:01.12.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
 
Event date:01.12.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL AC1
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:NLAC1 350001, 20001005
 
Event date:29.12.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:CHSPCFOFAG-NO W 5184/20.08.1996, 05.10.2000
 
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.05.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL KC1
Code Expl.: GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:NLKC1 350001, 20080610, EXPIRES: 20080720
 
Event date:01.08.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFG
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:GBCTFGSPC/GB00/026, 20010709, EXPIRES: 20080720
 
Event date:01.10.2001 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:0090022-5, 19951201
 
Event date:02.10.2001 
Event description:BE: GRANT OF A COMPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FOR HERBICIDES
Free Format Text:2000C/024, EXPIRES: 20080721
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:28.03.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCG
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: FIPRONIL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: OFAG W 5184 19960820
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C00295117/01
Filing DATE:20001005
Extension DATE:20110820
 
Event date:04.10.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR C2
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR CCP FOR PLANT PROTECTION GRANTED
Free Format Text:FRC2 00C0026, 20000922, EXPIRES: 20080721
 
Event date:03.01.2005 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:BASF AGRO B.V., ARNHEM (NL)-WAEDENSWIL-BRANCH
 
Event date:27.05.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR C3
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR CCP FOR PLANT PROTECTION REJECTED
Free Format Text:00C0024, 20000922
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:00C0024
Filing DATE:20000922
 
Event date:27.05.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR C3
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR CCP FOR PLANT PROTECTION REJECTED
Free Format Text:00C0025, 20000922
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:00C0025
Filing DATE:20000922
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AV
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
 
Event date:31.03.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:BASF AGRO B.V., ARNHEM (NL), WAEDENSWIL-BRANCH
Free Format Text:AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.#55, AVENUE RENE CASSIN#69009 LYON (FR) -TRANSFER TO- BASF AGRO B.V., ARNHEM (NL), WAEDENSWIL-BRANCH# #8820 WAEDENSWIL/AU (CH)
 
Event date:31.03.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCM
Code Expl.: CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:BASF AGRO B.V., ARNHEM (NL), WAEDENSWIL-BRANCH, CH
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A., FR
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C00295117/01
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:30.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2000C0026
 
Event date:03.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20070603
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:07.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20070607
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:07.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20070607
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:14.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20070614
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:14.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20070614
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:18.06.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20070618
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:17.07.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20070717
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:24.11.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20070606
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS
Owner Name:*BASF AGRO B.V.ARNHEM NL, WäDENSWIL-BRANCH, CH-882
Effective DATE:20060307
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER
Owner Name:*BASF AGRO B.V.ARNHEM NL, WäDENSWIL-BRANCH, CH-882
Effective DATE:20060307
 
Event date:02.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20070625
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20070816
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20070608
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.05.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20070514
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.06.2008 
Event description:BE: PATENT EXPIRED
Owner Name:*BASF AGRO B.V.
Effective DATE:20080610
 
Event date:02.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20080609
 
Event date:02.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFE
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE ENTERED INTO FORCE
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB00/026
Filing DATE:20001004
Expiry DATE:20080610
Extension DATE:20080720
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE CCRE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: FIPRONIL; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 9197/B 20000728; FIRST REGISTRATION NO/DATE: FR 9200308 19930721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2000C/024
Filing DATE:20001004
Expiry DATE:20080610
Extension DATE:20080721
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:01.08.2008 
Event description:NL: LAPSED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20080610
 
Event date:19.08.2008 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:31.10.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20080610
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20080609
 
Event date:17.02.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB SPCE
Code Expl.:-SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE EXPIRED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: FIPRONIL; REGISTERED: FR 9200308 19930721; UK HSE 6514 19980907
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB00/026
Filing DATE:20001004
Expiry DATE:20080610
Extension DATE:20080720
 
Event date:15.03.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCN
Code Expl.: CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION NEW REPRESENTATIVE
Free Format Text:FORMER REPRESENTANTIVE: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE, CHIL-BRANCH, CH
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C00295117/01
Name of Requester:BOVARD SA, CH
 
Event date:14.06.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20110614
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20080611
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCL
Code Expl.:-SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DELETION
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C00295117/01
 
Event date:31.03.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE CCRE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALDICARBE + FIPRONIL; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 8941/B 19970325
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2000C/023
Filing DATE:20001004
Expiry DATE:20080610
Extension DATE:20120325
 
Event date:30.04.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE CCRE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: FIPRONIL AND TRITICONAZOLE AND GUAZATINE; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 9115/B 19990615; FIRST REGISTRATION: FR 9700274 19980402
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2000C/022
Filing DATE:20011002
Expiry DATE:20080610
Extension DATE:20130402
Effective DATE:20130402