blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0307075

EP0307075 - Method and apparatus for measuring program execution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.1996
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.1996 [1996/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED
19333 Vallco Parkway Cupertino
California 95014-2599 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]For all designated states
TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED
19333 Vallco Parkway
Cupertino California 95014-2599 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bailey, Bruce William
7771 Squirehill Court
Cupertino California 95014 / US
[1989/11]
Representative(s)Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/11]Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date88306251.508.07.1988
[1989/11]
Priority number, dateUS1987007281110.07.1987         Original published format: US 72811
[1989/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0307075
Date:15.03.1989
Language:EN
[1989/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0307075
Date:10.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0307075
Date:04.10.1995
Language:EN
[1995/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1990
ClassificationIPC:G06F11/00
[1989/11]
CPC:
G06F11/3676 (EP,US); G06F11/3644 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1989/11]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Programmablaufmessung[1989/11]
English:Method and apparatus for measuring program execution[1989/11]
French:Méthode et appareil pour mesurer le déroulement d'exécution d'un programme[1989/11]
Examination procedure18.12.1990Examination requested  [1991/07]
04.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.09.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.1995Fee for grant paid
29.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.07.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
01.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
27.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2432024  (SIEMENS AG)
 [X]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 6, November 1982, page 3054, New York, US; D.J. BRADLEY et al.: "Determination of code coverage"
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 2, July 1981, page 1192, New York, US; R.J. BOWDRY et al.: "Permanent breakpoints using hardware trace"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.