Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0300754

EP0300754 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.1994
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.1999Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR, LU
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THORN EMI PLC
4 Tenterden Street
London W1A 2AY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/04]For all designated states
THORN EMI plc
4 Tenterden Street
London W1A 2AY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Morris, Christopher James
7, Gladstone Avenue
Feltham Middlesex, TW14 9LJ / GB
02 / Coulson, Ian
3, Westmead
Maidenhead Berkshire, SL6 7HQ / GB
03 / Surguy, Paul William Herbert
4, Hinton Road
Uxbridge Middlesex / GB
[1989/04]
Representative(s)Hurst, Richard Arthur Alexander , et al
THORN EMI Patents Limited, Central Research Laboratories, Dawley Road Hayes
Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/27]Hurst, Richard Arthur Alexander , et al
THORN EMI Patents Limited, Central Research Laboratories, Dawley Road
Hayes, Middlesex UB3 1HH / GB
Former [1989/04]Fleming, Ian Alexander
THORN EMI Patents Limited The Quadrangle Westmount Centre Uxbridge Road
Hayes Middlesex, UB4 0HB / GB
Application number, filing date88306636.720.07.1988
[1989/04]
Priority number, dateGB1987001717221.07.1987         Original published format: GB 8717172
GB1987001835103.08.1987         Original published format: GB 8718351
[1989/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0300754
Date:25.01.1989
Language:EN
[1989/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0300754
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0300754
Date:15.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.1990
ClassificationInternational:G09G3/36, G09G3/18
[1993/50]
Former International [1989/04]G09G3/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/04]
TitleGerman:Anzeigegerät[1989/04]
English:Display device[1989/04]
French:Dispositif d'affichage[1989/04]
Examination procedure09.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/38]
26.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.06.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.06.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.1993Fee for grant paid
09.07.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
26.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.12.1993
GR15.12.1993
LU31.07.1994
[2000/04]
Former [1994/46]AT15.12.1993
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB2173335  ;
 [A]EP0200427  ;
 [A]EP0197743