blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0303396

EP0303396 - Improved laser-blown links [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[1989/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Fischer, Frederick Harrison
2370 South Pewter Drive
Macungie Pennsylvania 18062 / US
[1989/07]
Representative(s)Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer Limited
Bedford House
21A John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/19]Williams, David John, et al
Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Former [1989/07]Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al
AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date88307183.903.08.1988
[1989/07]
Priority number, dateUS1987008453112.08.1987         Original published format: US 84531
[1989/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0303396
Date:15.02.1989
Language:EN
[1989/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.12.1988
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/52, H01L21/90
[1989/07]
CPC:
H01L23/5258 (EP,US); H01L21/60 (KR); B82Y30/00 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
C-Set:
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1989/07]
TitleGerman:Lasertrennbare Verbindungen[1989/07]
English:Improved laser-blown links[1989/07]
French:Connexions programmables par laser[1989/07]
Examination procedure09.08.1989Examination requested  [1989/41]
24.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.1995Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/41]
06.04.2001Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/41]
Appeal following examination09.09.1995Appeal received No.  T0982/95
24.11.1995Statement of grounds filed
08.03.2001Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
19.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
16.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 07
11.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 08
19.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 09
13.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 11
17.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 12
14.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 13
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200215   M06   Not yet paid
31.08.200316   M06   Not yet paid
31.08.200417   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP5823475  ;
 [Y]JP59957  ;
 [A]EP0089814  (FUJITSU LTD [JP])
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 103 (E-173)[1248], 6th May 1983; & JP-A-58 23 475 (FUJITSU K.K.) 12-02-1983, & JP5823475 A 00000000
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 81 (E³238)[1518], 13th April 1984; & JP-A-59 957 (FUJITSU K.K.) 06-01-1984, & JP59957 A 00000000
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 5, October 1979, pages 1971-1972, New York, US; B.K. AGGARWAL et al.: "Laser cutting metal through quartz"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.