Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0330782

EP0330782 - Particle separator for use with turbines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.1993
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.1993 [1993/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/36]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oliver, Wayne Robert
1 Harvard Street
Peabody Massachusetts 01960 / US
02 / Girardin, Dennis Russell
19B Garden Road
Peabody Massachusetts 01960 / US
03 / Moyer, Roy Elbert
6048 Bayberry Drive
Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US
[1989/36]
Representative(s)Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London
WC2R 3AA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/36]Pratt, Richard Wilson , et al
London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date88310346.703.11.1988
[1989/36]
Priority number, dateUS1988016437104.03.1988         Original published format: US 164371
[1989/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0330782
Date:06.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0330782
Date:20.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.1989
ClassificationInternational:F02C7/052, B64D33/02
[1989/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1989/36]
TitleGerman:Staubabscheider für Strahltriebwerke[1992/21]
English:Particle separator for use with turbines[1989/36]
French:Séparateur de particules pour turbines à gaz[1989/36]
Former [1989/36]Staubabscheider für Strahltriebwerk
Examination procedure05.02.1990Examination requested  [1990/14]
19.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.10.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.1992Fee for grant paid
09.01.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.02.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US3521431  ;
 [Y]US4509962  ;
 [Y]US2721715  ;
 [Y]US4704145  ;
 [A]US3148043  ;
 [A]GB663194  ;
 [A]GB2069053