blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0326747

EP0326747 - Radio data system receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.12.1999
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku
Tokyo 153 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/32]For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasa, Kohichi c/o Pioneer Electronic Corporation
Kawagoe Works No. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi
Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP
02 / Ichikawa, Toshihito Pioneer Electronic Corporation
Kawagoe Works No. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi
Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP
03 / Nishida, Junichi c/oPioneer Electronic Corporation
Kawagoe Works No. 25-1, Aza Nishi-machi
Oaza Yamada Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP
[1989/32]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/32]Brunner, Michael John, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date88310497.808.11.1988
[1989/32]
Priority number, dateJP1988002540305.02.1988         Original published format: JP 2540388
[1989/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0326747
Date:09.08.1989
Language:EN
[1989/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0326747
Date:15.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0326747
Date:03.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:H03J7/18
[1989/32]
CPC:
H03J1/0066 (EP); H04H20/22 (EP); H04H20/26 (EP);
H04H2201/13 (EP); H04H40/18 (EP); H04H60/13 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1989/32]
TitleGerman:Empfänger für RDS[1989/32]
English:Radio data system receiver[1989/32]
French:Récepteur pour RDS[1989/32]
Examination procedure15.03.1990Examination requested  [1990/20]
30.07.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.01.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.02.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.1994Fee for grant paid
26.04.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.04.1995  18.05.1995  ADMISSIBLE
GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG
Kurgartenstrasse 37
D-90762 Fürth / DE
 02  02.05.1995  01.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
 03  03.05.1995  18.05.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/26]
Opponent(s)01  28.04.1995  18.05.1995  ADMISSIBLE
GRUNDIG E.M.V. Elektro-Mechanische Versuchsanstalt Max Grundig GmbH & Co. KG
Kurgartenstrasse 37
D-90762 Fürth / DE
 02  02.05.1995  01.06.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
 03  03.05.1995  18.05.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG
Bahnstrasse 62
D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE
07.06.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.10.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
13.05.1997Date of oral proceedings
11.06.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.11.1999Legal effect of revocation of patent [2000/03]
02.12.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition06.08.1997Appeal received No.  T0843/97
21.10.1997Statement of grounds filed
10.11.1999Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
10.11.1999Date of oral proceedings
12.11.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
11.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3149409
 [A]  - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. CE-33, no. 3, August 1987, pages 319-325, IEEE, New York, NY, US; K. TAURA et al.: "Automatic tuning car radio based on the radio data system"
ExaminationEP0224763
    - Specification of the Radio Data System RDS for VHF/FM sound broadcasting, Editor: Rudolf Gressmann, Technical Centre of the European Broadcasting Union, Bruxelles, 1984.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.