Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0319314

EP0319314 - Dual function disposable absorbent insert having a removable backsheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.11.1992
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.1992Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.12.1992 [1992/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [1989/23]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Litchholt, John Joseh
101 Hopping Court
Harrison Ohio 45030 / US
[1989/23]
Representative(s)Gibson, Tony Nicholas , et al
Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/23]Gibson, Tony Nicholas , et al
Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road
Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date88311433.202.12.1988
[1989/23]
Priority number, dateUS1987012836403.12.1987         Original published format: US 128364
[1989/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0319314
Date:07.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0319314
Date:24.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1989
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/16
[1989/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/23]
TitleGerman:Wegwerfbare, absorbierende Einlage mit zwei Funktionen und mit abziehbarem Abdeckblatt[1989/23]
English:Dual function disposable absorbent insert having a removable backsheet[1989/23]
French:Culotte jetable à double fonction ayant une feuille arrière détachable[1989/23]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure29.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/34]
03.07.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/53]
03.08.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1992/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.199204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2142541  (PROCTER & GAMBLE);
 [A]EP0059014  ;
 [A]US4701170  (WILSON JOHN C [US], et al);
 [AD]US3886941  (DUANE JOHN J, et al);
 [A]GB2142241  (PROCTER & GAMBLE);
 [AD]US4327729  (KING LAWRENCE W);
 [A]EP0203712  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [AD]US3842838  (GELLERT D)