Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0320300

EP0320300 - Television image processing system having capture, merge and display capability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.1991
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.12.1991 [1991/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IDR INC.
P.O. Box 13008
Hauppauge, N.Y. 11778 / US
[1989/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Russell, David P.
P.O. Box 13008
Hauppauge N.Y. 11788 / US
02 / Papwoth, Raymond C.
7 Church Lane
Royston Herts. SG8 9LG / GB
[1989/24]
Representative(s)Johnson, Terence Leslie , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/24]Johnson, Terence Leslie , et al
Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1SD / GB
Application number, filing date88311712.909.12.1988
[1989/24]
Priority number, dateUS1987013199211.12.1987         Original published format: US 131992
[1989/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0320300
Date:14.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/24]
ClassificationInternational:H04N9/64
[1989/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1989/24]
TitleGerman:Fernsehbildverarbeitungssystem mit Auffangs-, Mischungs- und Wiedergabefähigkeit[1989/24]
English:Television image processing system having capture, merge and display capability[1989/24]
French:Système de traitement d'image de télévision ayant la capacité de saisie, de fondu et d'affichage[1989/24]
File destroyed:09.03.1999
Examination procedure03.07.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/51]
26.07.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1991/51]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.01.199103   M06   Not yet paid