blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0322213

EP0322213 - Process for the preparation of fatty acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1995
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - applicantpublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars London
EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1993/09]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Former [1989/26]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:AT  BE  CH  DE  ES  FR  GR  IT  LI  NL  SE 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Macrae, Alasdair Robin
Ivy Cottage
Newton Blossomville Bedford MK43 8AN / GB
02 / Bosley, John Anthony
43 Kettering Road Islip
Kettering Northants. NN14 3JT / GB
03 / Peilow, Alan David
17 Lancaster Close
Wollaston Northants. NN9 7PD / GB
[1989/26]
Representative(s)Dries, Antonius Johannes Maria, et al
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
[N/P]
Former [1990/27]Dries, Antonius Johannes Maria, et al
Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137
NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL
Former [1989/26]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date88312116.221.12.1988
[1989/26]
Priority number, dateGB1987002989022.12.1987         Original published format: GB 8729890
[1989/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0322213
Date:28.06.1989
Language:EN
[1989/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0322213
Date:30.05.1990
Language:EN
[1990/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0322213
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:C12P7/64, C12N11/08, // (C12P7/64, C12N9:20)
[1989/26]
CPC:
C12P7/6458 (EP,US); C12N11/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1989/26]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fettsäureestern[1989/26]
English:Process for the preparation of fatty acid esters[1989/26]
French:Procédé de préparation d'esters d'acides gras[1989/26]
Examination procedure29.06.1990Examination requested  [1990/34]
25.03.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.03.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.1993Fee for grant paid
02.04.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
10.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0195311  (YOSHIKAWA OIL & FAT [JP]);
 [YD]US4629742  (BRADY CATHERINE D [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.